This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 10/25/2020 at 22:59:05 (UTC).

BATES, NICHOLAS vs. ST LUCIE COUNTY SCHOOL DISTRICT

Case Summary

On 02/04/2019 BATES, NICHOLAS filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against ST LUCIE COUNTY SCHOOL DISTRICT. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BRONIS, BARBARA W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0234

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BRONIS, BARBARA W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BATES, NICHOLAS

Defendant

ST LUCIE COUNTY SCHOOL DISTRICT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HELLER, JOSHUA LEE

Defendant Attorney

GONZALES, ANTHONY RICHARD

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY ( V )

5/3/2019: NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY ( V )

RESPONSE TO MOTION ( V )

4/26/2019: RESPONSE TO MOTION ( V )

MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER ( V )

4/23/2019: MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER ( V )

MOTION TO DISMISS ( V )

3/28/2019: MOTION TO DISMISS ( V )

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

3/14/2019: RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

2/4/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

2/4/2019: REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

INTERROGATORIES ( V )

2/4/2019: INTERROGATORIES ( V )

COMPLAINT ( V )

2/4/2019: COMPLAINT ( V )

NOTICE OF COMPLETION OR COMPLIANCE ( V )

9/30/2020: NOTICE OF COMPLETION OR COMPLIANCE ( V )

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

8/26/2020: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

8/25/2020: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

6/4/2020: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

ORDER ON MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER - MOOT

6/4/2020: ORDER ON MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER - MOOT

RESPONSE TO MOTION TO DISMISS

5/19/2020: RESPONSE TO MOTION TO DISMISS

COMPLAINT - AMENDED ( V )

2/14/2020: COMPLAINT - AMENDED ( V )

ORDER OF DISMISSAL ( V )

2/6/2020: ORDER OF DISMISSAL ( V )

NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY ( V )

12/23/2019: NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY ( V )

38 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COMPLETION OR COMPLIANCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR COPIES ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCEL DEPOSITION ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCEL DEPOSITION ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR COPIES ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR COPIES ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR COPIES ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

    Read MoreRead Less
45 More Docket Entries
  • 02/05/2019
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE BRONIS, BARBARA W: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • DocketPLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: HELLER, JOSHUA LEE ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • DocketPAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2019000010511 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 84377440 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20190205235959.TXT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINTERROGATORIES ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • DocketCASE FILED 02/04/2019 CASE NUMBER 2019CA000234

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ST LUCIE COUNTY SCHOOL DISTRICT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GONZALES, ANTHONY RICHARD