Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 02/11/2021 at 21:35:40 (UTC).

BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON vs. SANCHEZ, JOHN

Case Summary

On 03/24/2020 BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against SANCHEZ, JOHN. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is METZGER, ELIZABETH A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0485

  • Filing Date:

    03/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

METZGER, ELIZABETH A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON

Defendants

SANCHEZ, LEONARDO

VITTA, GRETTA

SANCHEZ, AURA

UNKNOWN TENANT

SANCHEZ, JOHN

TD BANK N A

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF LEONARDO SANCHEZ

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

THALER HOLDINGS LLC

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF GRETTA VITTA

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF AURA SANCHEZ

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JOHN SANCHEZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ALBAUM, BRIAN

MARRA, MARC ANTHONY

GRIFFITHS, HEATHER

 

Court Documents

DEFAULT ( V )

2/9/2021: DEFAULT ( V )

MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT ( V )

2/9/2021: MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT ( V )

MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT ( V )

2/9/2021: MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT ( V )

NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY ( V )

2/9/2021: NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY ( V )

DEFAULT FOR ENTRY BY CLERK ( V )

2/9/2021: DEFAULT FOR ENTRY BY CLERK ( V )

MOTION FOR DEFAULT ( V )

2/9/2021: MOTION FOR DEFAULT ( V )

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

1/28/2021: RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

1/28/2021: RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS UNSERVED ( V )

1/28/2021: RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS UNSERVED ( V )

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

3/18/2020: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

3/18/2020: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

3/18/2020: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

3/18/2020: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

CERTIFICATE OF POSSESSION OF NOTE

3/18/2020: CERTIFICATE OF POSSESSION OF NOTE

VALUE CALCULATION FOR REAL PROPERTY

3/18/2020: VALUE CALCULATION FOR REAL PROPERTY

LIS PENDENS

3/18/2020: LIS PENDENS

COMPLAINT

3/18/2020: COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

3/18/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET

41 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/09/2021
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: MARRA, MARC ANTHONY - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2020CA000485, BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON VS. SANCHEZ, JOHN - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: DEF-2/9/2021"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT FOR ENTRY BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS UNSERVED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
49 More Docket Entries
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF POSSESSION OF NOTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVALUE CALCULATION FOR REAL PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TD Bank, NA is a litigant

Latest cases where The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, NA is a litigant

Latest cases where Midland Funding, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MARRA, MARC