This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 10/31/2020 at 13:45:55 (UTC).

BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON vs. PAEZ, XAVIER S

Case Summary

On 06/17/2019 BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against PAEZ, XAVIER S. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is METZGER, ELIZABETH A. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1223

  • Filing Date:

    06/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

METZGER, ELIZABETH A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON

Defendants

UNKNOWN TENANT #2

CLERK OF THE 19TH JUDICIAL CIRCUIT FOR SAINT LUCIE COUNTY FLORIDA

PAEZ, XAVIER S

WASTE PRO USA

CITY OF PORT ST LUCIE FLORIDA

UNKNOWN TENANT #1

OSTEEN, TABITHA

PAEZ, KELLI A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MARRA, MARC ANTHONY

Defendant Attorneys

HARLOWE, SCOTT ROBERT

BAGGETT, LEE JAMES

LLOYD, COLIN VINCENT

 

Court Documents

AFFIDAVIT TO SUPPORT MOTION ( V )

11/6/2019: AFFIDAVIT TO SUPPORT MOTION ( V )

MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT ( V )

8/1/2019: MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT ( V )

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

7/15/2019: RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

7/15/2019: RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

6/19/2019: SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

6/17/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

VALUE CALCULATION FOR REAL PROPERTY ( V )

6/17/2019: VALUE CALCULATION FOR REAL PROPERTY ( V )

COMPLAINT ( V )

6/17/2019: COMPLAINT ( V )

CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

6/17/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

ORDER OF DISMISSAL, RELEASE OF LIS PENDENS AND RELEASE OF ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS - Recorded (Other.4443.960 / 4727043)

7/8/2020: ORDER OF DISMISSAL, RELEASE OF LIS PENDENS AND RELEASE OF ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS - Recorded (Other.4443.960 / 4727043)

CORRESPONDENCE

7/8/2020: CORRESPONDENCE

ORDER OF DISMISSAL, RELEASE OF LIS PENDENS AND RELEASE OF ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS

7/8/2020: ORDER OF DISMISSAL, RELEASE OF LIS PENDENS AND RELEASE OF ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS

CORRESPONDENCE

7/8/2020: CORRESPONDENCE

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

7/7/2020: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

MOTION TO DISMISS

7/7/2020: MOTION TO DISMISS

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION HEARING ( V )

1/14/2020: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION HEARING ( V )

SUGGESTION BANKRUPTCY ( V )

1/10/2020: SUGGESTION BANKRUPTCY ( V )

NOTICE OF FILING COPIES OF LOAN DOCUMENTS ( V )

12/19/2019: NOTICE OF FILING COPIES OF LOAN DOCUMENTS ( V )

47 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/08/2020
  • DocketAttorney MARC ANTHONY MARRA - Deactivated by Automated Process

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2020
  • DocketAttorney COLIN VINCENT LLOYD - Deactivated by Automated Process

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2020
  • DocketAttorney SCOTT ROBERT HARLOWE - Deactivated by Automated Process

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2020
  • DocketAttorney LEE JAMES BAGGETT - Deactivated by Automated Process

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL, RELEASE OF LIS PENDENS AND RELEASE OF ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS - Recorded (Other.4443.960 / 4727043)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketRELEASE OF ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS TO PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY VIA FEDEX

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL, RELEASE OF LIS PENDENS AND RELEASE OF ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
59 More Docket Entries
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVALUE CALCULATION FOR REAL PROPERTY ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE MIRMAN, LAWRENCE: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • DocketPLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: MARRA, MARC ANTHONY ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS ASSESSED $9.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS CIR CIV ASSESSED $80.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • DocketMF 50,001<250,000 ASSESSED $905.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • DocketCASE FILED 06/17/2019 CASE NUMBER 2019CA001223

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WASTE PRO USA INC is a litigant

Latest cases where CITY OF PORT ST LUCIE FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases where The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, NA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MARRA, MARC