This case was last updated from St. Lucie County Courts on 11/02/2020 at 08:41:17 (UTC).

BANK OF AMERICA NA vs. SUPPLE, GREGORY

Case Summary

On 09/10/2019 BANK OF AMERICA NA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against SUPPLE, GREGORY. This case was filed in St. Lucie County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ISENHOWER, DARYL. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3230

  • Filing Date:

    09/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ISENHOWER, DARYL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BANK OF AMERICA NA

Defendant

SUPPLE, GREGORY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PALMA, JORGE LUIS

 

Court Documents

ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4396.2041 / 4688190) ( V )

3/16/2020: ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4396.2041 / 4688190) ( V )

ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT ( V )

3/16/2020: ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT ( V )

MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT STIPULATION ( V )

11/21/2019: MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT STIPULATION ( V )

STIPULATION - Recorded (Other.4342.137 / 4637729) ( V )

11/5/2019: STIPULATION - Recorded (Other.4342.137 / 4637729) ( V )

STIPULATION ( V )

11/4/2019: STIPULATION ( V )

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE- LIMITED ( V )

11/4/2019: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE- LIMITED ( V )

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

9/16/2019: RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

9/10/2019: SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

9/9/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT ( V )

9/9/2019: MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT ( V )

COMPLAINT ( V )

9/9/2019: COMPLAINT ( V )

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2020
  • DocketAttorney JORGE LUIS PALMA - Deactivated by Automated Process

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4396.2041 / 4688190) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT STIPULATION ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - Recorded (Other.4342.137 / 4637729) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • HearingEvent: PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE; Judge: ISENHOWER, DARYL; Location: Courtroom L - SC; Result: CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE- LIMITED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 11/04/2019 AT 1:30 PM IN L/ , COUNTY JUDGE: ISENHOWER, DARYL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • DocketCOUNTY JUDGE ISENHOWER, DARYL: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • DocketPLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: PALMA, JORGE LUIS ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • DocketCASE FILED 09/10/2019 CASE NUMBER 2019SC003230

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • DocketPAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2019000074740 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 95416208 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20190910235959.TXT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • DocketNOTICE CONF INFO ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bank of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Palma, Jorge L, ESQ.