This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 06/04/2020 at 08:44:12 (UTC).

BANK OF AMERICA NA vs. MELLIN, CHRISTOPHER

Case Summary

On 12/16/2019 BANK OF AMERICA NA filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against MELLIN, CHRISTOPHER. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is METZGER, ELIZABETH A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2389

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

METZGER, ELIZABETH A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BANK OF AMERICA NA

Defendant

MELLIN, CHRISTOPHER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PALMA, JORGE LUIS

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ( V )

1/21/2020: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ( V )

REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

1/21/2020: REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

INTERROGATORIES ( V )

1/21/2020: INTERROGATORIES ( V )

ANSWER ( V )

1/14/2020: ANSWER ( V )

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

12/19/2019: RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

12/16/2019: SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

12/13/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT ( V )

12/13/2019: MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT ( V )

COMPLAINT ( V )

12/13/2019: COMPLAINT ( V )

CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

12/13/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/03/2020
  • DocketNOTICE CONF INFO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • DocketMOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINTERROGATORIES ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • FinancialReceipt #: 2019000104450; Applied Amount; $410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: PALMA, JORGE LUIS - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2019CA002389, BANK OF AMERICA NA VS. MELLIN, CHRISTOPHER - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: SUMI-12/16/2019"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE METZGER, ELIZABETH A: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • DocketPLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: PALMA, JORGE LUIS ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • DocketCASE FILED 12/16/2019 CASE NUMBER 2019CA002389

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • DocketPAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2019000104450 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 100318618 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20191216235959.TXT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • DocketNOTICE CONF INFO ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less