This case was last updated from St. Lucie County Courts on 10/11/2020 at 18:29:23 (UTC).

BANK OF AMERICA NA vs. LI, JUN

Case Summary

On 10/18/2017 BANK OF AMERICA NA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against LI, JUN. This case was filed in St. Lucie County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ISENHOWER, DARYL. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1924

  • Filing Date:

    10/18/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ISENHOWER, DARYL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BANK OF AMERICA NA

Defendant

LI, JUN

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

10/18/2017: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

COMPLAINT ( V )

10/18/2017: COMPLAINT ( V )

SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

10/18/2017: SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ( V )

10/27/2017: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ( V )

ORDER TO RESET PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION ( V )

11/28/2017: ORDER TO RESET PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION ( V )

ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT ( V )

12/18/2017: ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT ( V )

ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4084.321 / 4387886) ( V )

1/5/2018: ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4084.321 / 4387886) ( V )

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-COMPLIANCE ( V )

8/9/2018: AFFIDAVIT OF NON-COMPLIANCE ( V )

FINAL JUDGMENT AFTER DEFAULT (GENERAL FORM) ( V )

8/31/2018: FINAL JUDGMENT AFTER DEFAULT (GENERAL FORM) ( V )

FINAL JUDGMENT AFTER DEFAULT (GENERAL FORM) ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4176.2784 / 4477255) ( V )

9/5/2018: FINAL JUDGMENT AFTER DEFAULT (GENERAL FORM) ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4176.2784 / 4477255) ( V )

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketAttorney JASON SCOTT DRAGUTSKY - Deactivated by Automated Process

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT AFTER DEFAULT (GENERAL FORM) ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4176.2784 / 4477255) ( V )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • DocketREOPENED CASE CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT AFTER DEFAULT (GENERAL FORM) ( V )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • DocketCASE REOPENED FOR AFFIDAVIT OF NON PAYMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON-COMPLIANCE ( V )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4084.321 / 4387886) ( V )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • HearingEvent: PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE; Judge: ISENHOWER, DARYL; Location: Courtroom L - SC; Result: DISPOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT ( V )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 10/19/2017
  • FinancialReceipt #: 2017000076835; Applied Amount; $310.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: DRAGUTSKY, JASON SCOTT - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2017SC001924, BANK OF AMERICA NA VS. LI, JUN - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: SUMI-10/18/2017"

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 11/27/2017 AT 1:30 PM IN L/ , COUNTY JUDGE: ISENHOWER, DARYL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • DocketCOUNTY JUDGE ISENHOWER, DARYL: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT ( V )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • DocketPLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: DRAGUTSKY, JASON SCOTT ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • DocketCASE FILED 10/18/2017 CASE NUMBER 2017SC001924

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • DocketPAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2017000076835 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 62985873 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20171018235959.TXT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bank of America is a litigant