This case was last updated from St. Lucie County Courts on 05/30/2022 at 09:29:07 (UTC).

BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. vs. ANGEL, RICHARD HARRY

Case Summary

On 01/08/2021 BANK OF AMERICA, N A filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ANGEL, RICHARD HARRY. This case was filed in St. Lucie County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ISENHOWER, DARYL. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0080

  • Filing Date:

    01/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ISENHOWER, DARYL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.

Defendant

ANGEL, RICHARD HARRY

Port Saint Lucie, FL 34983-4620

Garnishee

TRIUMPH AEROSTRUCTURES LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

STERN, DANA MICHELLE

DRAGUTSKY, JASON SCOTT

1 STERN, DANA MICHELLE 2 DRAGUTSKY, JASON SCOTT

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

1/8/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

1/8/2021: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

COMPLAINT

1/8/2021: COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ISSUED

1/11/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED

SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT

2/15/2022: SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF GARNISHMENT

2/4/2022: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF GARNISHMENT

MOTION FOR ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT ( V )

11/30/2021: MOTION FOR ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT ( V )

NOTICE OF EXTENSION PURSURANT TO FLORIDA STATUTE ( V )

11/3/2021: NOTICE OF EXTENSION PURSURANT TO FLORIDA STATUTE ( V )

NOTICE TO DEFENDANT ON GARNISHMENT ( V )

11/3/2021: NOTICE TO DEFENDANT ON GARNISHMENT ( V )

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ( V )

11/3/2021: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ( V )

NOTICE TO DEFENDANT ON GARNISHMENT ( V )

10/4/2021: NOTICE TO DEFENDANT ON GARNISHMENT ( V )

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

10/1/2021: RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

ORDER FOR WRIT ( V )

9/28/2021: ORDER FOR WRIT ( V )

MOTION FOR WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ( V )

8/27/2021: MOTION FOR WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ( V )

FINAL JUDGMENT AFTER DEFAULT (GENERAL FORM) - Recorded (Other.4586.2417 / 4844207)

4/7/2021: FINAL JUDGMENT AFTER DEFAULT (GENERAL FORM) - Recorded (Other.4586.2417 / 4844207)

FINAL JUDGMENT AFTER DEFAULT (GENERAL FORM)

3/23/2021: FINAL JUDGMENT AFTER DEFAULT (GENERAL FORM)

MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

3/18/2021: MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT

3/18/2021: AFFIDAVIT

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • DocketREOPENED CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF GARNISHMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF EXTENSION PURSURANT TO FLORIDA STATUTE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO DEFENDANT ON GARNISHMENT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO DEFENDANT ON GARNISHMENT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER FOR WRIT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 03/01/2021 AT 1:30 PM IN L/ , COUNTY JUDGE: ISENHOWER, DARYL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketCOUNTY JUDGE ISENHOWER, DARYL: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketPLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: STERN, DANA MICHELLE ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketPLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: DRAGUTSKY, JASON SCOTT ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketPAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2021000002723 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 119312347 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20210111235959.TXT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketCASE FILED 01/08/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021SC000080

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TRIUMPH AEROSTRUCTURES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Bank of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer STERN , DANA M