Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 10/25/2020 at 08:33:56 (UTC).

BANK OF AMERICA N A vs. MARTIN, DELORIS

Case Summary

On 01/18/2019 BANK OF AMERICA N A filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against MARTIN, DELORIS. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is METZGER, ELIZABETH A. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0119

  • Filing Date:

    01/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

METZGER, ELIZABETH A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BANK OF AMERICA N A

Defendants

ANY AND ALL UNKNOWN PARTIES CLAIMING BY, THROUGH, UNDER AND AGAINST THE NAMED INDIVIDUAL DEFEDANT(S) WHO ARE NOT KNOWN TO BE DEAD OR ALIVE, WHETHER UNKNOWN PARTIES MAY CLAIM AN INTEREST AS SPOUSES, HEIRS, DEVISEES, GRANTEES, OR OTHER CLAIMANTS

UNKNOWN TENANT 1

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF GARTH MARTIN

UNKNOWN TENANT 2

GREATWIDE LOGISTICS SERVICES INC

MARTIN, DELORIS

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE

MARTIN, GARTH

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF DELORIS MARTIN

MARTIN, FLORENCE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

TROMBERG, ANDREA RACHAEL

STECCO, PHILIP

HYATT, MARLON CHRISTOPHER

Defendant Attorney

ENGVALSON, KINLEY I

 

Court Documents

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM ( V )

10/30/2019: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM ( V )

REPLY ( V )

7/23/2019: REPLY ( V )

INTERROGATORIES ( V )

7/12/2019: INTERROGATORIES ( V )

ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES ( V )

7/12/2019: ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES ( V )

MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT ( V )

4/15/2019: MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT ( V )

NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY ( V )

3/11/2019: NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY ( V )

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME ( V )

2/19/2019: MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME ( V )

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

2/19/2019: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

1/18/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME ( V )

8/6/2019: MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME ( V )

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ( V )

7/12/2019: CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ( V )

REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

7/12/2019: REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

3/1/2019: RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

2/5/2019: RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4225.2499 / 4523711) ( V )

1/24/2019: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4225.2499 / 4523711) ( V )

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

1/18/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

1/18/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

1/18/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

42 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/29/2019
  • DocketAttorney PHILIP STECCO - Deactivated by Automated Process

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2019
  • DocketAttorney ANDREA RACHAEL TROMBERG - Deactivated by Automated Process

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2019
  • DocketAttorney KINLEY I ENGVALSON - Deactivated by Automated Process

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2019
  • DocketAttorney KINLEY I ENGVALSON - Deactivated by Automated Process

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • FinancialReceipt #: 2019000090290; Applied Amount; $27.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4340.1533 / 4636324) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • DocketPAYMENT $27.00 RECEIPT #2019000090290 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 98124620 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20191031235959.TXT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
54 More Docket Entries
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVALUE CALCULATION FOR REAL PROPERTY ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE MIRMAN, LAWRENCE: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS ASSESSED $5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS CIR CIV ASSESSED $90.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • DocketMF 50,001<250,000 ASSESSED $905.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • DocketCASE FILED 01/18/2019 CASE NUMBER 2019CA000119

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE is a litigant

Latest cases where Unite States of America Dept of Treasury is a litigant

Latest cases where Bank of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Engvalson, Kinley I