This case was last updated from St. Lucie County - Nineteenth Judicial Circuit Court on 11/26/2022 at 05:37:11 (UTC).

BAIRES, ELVIN MILTON vs. GEICO INDEMNITY CO

Case Summary

On 09/27/2022 BAIRES, ELVIN MILTON filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GEICO INDEMNITY CO. This case was filed in St. Lucie County - Nineteenth Judicial Circuit Court, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BUCHANAN, LAURIE E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1824

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BUCHANAN, LAURIE E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BAIRES, ELVIN MILTON

Defendant

GEICO INDEMNITY CO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WEISBERG, MICHAEL PETER

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

9/27/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

9/27/2022: COMPLAINT

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

9/27/2022: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

SUMMONS ISSUED

9/27/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED

MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT

11/3/2022: MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT

COMPLAINT-AMENDED

11/15/2022: COMPLAINT-AMENDED

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-AMENDED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: WEISBERG, MICHAEL PETER - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2022CA001824, BAIRES, ELVIN MILTON VS. GEICO INDEMNITY CO - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: SUMI-9/27/2022"

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE BUCHANAN, LAURIE E: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketPLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: WEISBERG, MICHAEL PETER ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketCASE FILED 09/27/2022 CASE NUMBER 2022CA001824

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketPAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2022000075699 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 158178143 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20220927235959.TXT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Weisberg, Michael Peter