This case was last updated from St. Lucie County Courts on 05/23/2022 at 05:40:20 (UTC).

AVILA, ALBERT vs. ERNST, LILLIAN

Case Summary

On 11/10/2021 AVILA, ALBERT filed an Other lawsuit against ERNST, LILLIAN. This case was filed in St. Lucie County Courts, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ALONZO, EDMOND W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2605

  • Filing Date:

    11/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ALONZO, EDMOND W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AVILA, ALBERT

Defendant

ERNST, LILLIAN

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER ( V )

11/10/2021: COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER ( V )

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS ( V )

11/10/2021: DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS ( V )

ACKNOWLEDGMENT ( V )

11/10/2021: ACKNOWLEDGMENT ( V )

EVICTION SUMMONS

11/10/2021: EVICTION SUMMONS

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

11/18/2021: RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

3/21/2022: ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/28/2022
  • HearingEvent: STATUS CONFERENCE; Judge: ALONZO, EDMOND W; Location: Courtroom K - SC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • DocketSTATUS CONFERENCE SET FOR 06/28/2022 AT 1:30 PM IN K/ , COUNTY JUDGE: ALONZO, EDMOND W

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketPAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2021000087140

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEVICTION SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACKNOWLEDGMENT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketFILING CLAIM > $2500 ASSESSED $300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketCOUNTY JUDGE ALONZO, EDMOND W: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketEACH DEFT OVER 5-CNTY CIVIL ASSESSED $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketCASE FILED 11/10/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021CC002605

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS-CNTY CIVIL ASSESSED $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less