Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 10/24/2020 at 22:47:46 (UTC).

ATLANTIC BAY MORTGAGE GROUP LLC vs. PANCHOOSINGH, BINESHRI

Case Summary

On 12/18/2018 ATLANTIC BAY MORTGAGE GROUP LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against PANCHOOSINGH, BINESHRI. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is METZGER, ELIZABETH A. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2321

  • Filing Date:

    12/18/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

METZGER, ELIZABETH A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ATLANTIC BAY MORTGAGE GROUP LLC

Defendants

CITY OF PORT ST LUCIE

UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION OF THE SUBJECT PROPERTY

BHAIRO, RAMKOWARIE

UNK HEIRS ESTATE OF BINESHRI PANCHOOSIGH

PANCHOOSINGH, RAJDAI

PANCHOOSINGH, BINESHRI

Guardian Ad Litem

KITE-POWELL ESQ., JULIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SEIDEN, JEFFREY MICHAEL

KASSAHUN, ALEMAYEHU

FORCE, STEVEN L

SAEED, AAMIR HAYAT

FULLER, SHANE

PATEL, PRATIK R

STORRINGS, JASON A

GALIPAULT, JOANNE MARY

JORDAN, MIGDALIA

Defendant Attorneys

BAGGETT, LEE JAMES

POPRAWSKI, SEBASTIAN KAZIMIERZ

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF SERVICE ( V )

9/30/2020: NOTICE OF SERVICE ( V )

NOTICE OF HEARING ( V )

9/9/2020: NOTICE OF HEARING ( V )

ORDER ON CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ( V )

3/10/2020: ORDER ON CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ( V )

AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS ( V )

1/21/2020: AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS ( V )

AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS ( V )

1/21/2020: AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS ( V )

MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT ( V )

9/16/2019: MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT ( V )

RETURN PLEADING FORM - MISSING DOCUMENTS

7/31/2019: RETURN PLEADING FORM - MISSING DOCUMENTS

NOTICE OF ACTION ( V )

7/31/2019: NOTICE OF ACTION ( V )

AFFIDAVIT OF CONSTRUCTIVE SERVICE ( V )

7/26/2019: AFFIDAVIT OF CONSTRUCTIVE SERVICE ( V )

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

7/16/2019: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

ANSWER - CITY OF PSL ( V )

7/16/2019: ANSWER - CITY OF PSL ( V )

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

6/19/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO AMEND COMPLAINT ( V )

6/18/2019: ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO AMEND COMPLAINT ( V )

NOTICE OF HEARING ( V )

5/29/2019: NOTICE OF HEARING ( V )

MOTION TO AMEND COMPLAINT ( V )

5/24/2019: MOTION TO AMEND COMPLAINT ( V )

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS UNSERVED ( V )

1/21/2019: RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS UNSERVED ( V )

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

12/17/2018: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

12/17/2018: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

68 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2020
  • HearingEvent: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: METZGER, ELIZABETH A; Location: Courtroom 3E - HC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • HearingEvent: FORECLOSURE SALE; Judge: FORECLOSURE SALE; Location: stlucie.clerkauction.com

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • FinancialReceipt #: 2020000073893; Applied Amount; $130.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SALE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketPAYMENT $130.00 RECEIPT #2020000073893 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 115082053 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20201016235959.TXT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4481.2078 / 4759074) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • HearingEvent: HEARING; Judge: METZGER, ELIZABETH A; Location: Courtroom 3E - HC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketFORECLOSURE SALE SET FOR 11/17/2020 AT 8:00 AM IN ONLINE/ , : FORECLOSURE SALE

    Read MoreRead Less
101 More Docket Entries
  • 12/18/2018
  • DocketPAYMENT $944.00 RECEIPT #2018000095886 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 82198269 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20181218235959.TXT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVALUE CALCULATION FOR REAL PROPERTY ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF POSSESSION OF NOTE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CITY OF PORT ST LUCIE FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JORDAN MIGDALIA

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ALEMAYEHU KASSAHUN, ESQ

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Storrings, Jason A