This case was last updated from St. Lucie County Courts on 10/29/2020 at 12:51:56 (UTC).

ATKINSON, LOIS vs. ATKINSON, GREGORY LEE

Case Summary

On 04/17/2019 ATKINSON, LOIS filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against ATKINSON, GREGORY LEE. This case was filed in St. Lucie County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MCCANN, JAMES W. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0995

  • Filing Date:

    04/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MCCANN, JAMES W

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ATKINSON, LOIS

Respondent

ATKINSON, GREGORY LEE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

GORMAN, JEFF T

Respondent Attorney

BATTISTA, JEFFREY PAUL

 

Court Documents

FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH NO PROPERTY OR DEPENDENT OR MINOR CHILD(REN) (UNCONTESTED) ( V )

10/7/2019: FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH NO PROPERTY OR DEPENDENT OR MINOR CHILD(REN) (UNCONTESTED) ( V )

ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT ( V )

7/25/2019: ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT ( V )

STIPULATION ( V )

7/22/2019: STIPULATION ( V )

MEDIATION AGREEMENT ( V )

7/22/2019: MEDIATION AGREEMENT ( V )

CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH MANDATORY DISCLOSURE ( V )

5/7/2019: CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH MANDATORY DISCLOSURE ( V )

NOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES ( V )

4/24/2019: NOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES ( V )

NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS ( V )

4/24/2019: NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS ( V )

ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE ( V )

4/24/2019: ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE ( V )

STANDING TEMPORARY DOMESTIC RELATIONS ORDER ( V )

4/17/2019: STANDING TEMPORARY DOMESTIC RELATIONS ORDER ( V )

COURT NOTES

10/7/2019: COURT NOTES

ANSWER ( V )

5/13/2019: ANSWER ( V )

NOTICE OF FILING ( V )

5/7/2019: NOTICE OF FILING ( V )

REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

4/24/2019: REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

4/24/2019: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

INTERROGATORIES ( V )

4/17/2019: INTERROGATORIES ( V )

REQUEST ( V )

4/17/2019: REQUEST ( V )

NOTICE OF FILING ( V )

4/17/2019: NOTICE OF FILING ( V )

PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE ( V )

4/17/2019: PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE ( V )

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/06/2019
  • DocketAttorney JEFF T GORMAN - Deactivated by Automated Process

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • DocketAttorney JEFFREY PAUL BATTISTA - Deactivated by Automated Process

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH NO PROPERTY OR DEPENDENT OR MINOR CHILD(REN) (UNCONTESTED) ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4334.2979 / 4631004) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • HearingEvent: HEARING; Judge: MCCANN, JAMES W; Location: Courtroom 4B - HC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH NO PROPERTY OR DEPENDENT OR MINOR CHILD(REN) (UNCONTESTED) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • DocketHEARING SET FOR 10/07/2019 AT 9:00 AM IN 4B/ , CIRCUIT JUDGE: MCCANN, JAMES W

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • DocketSEALED SS# DISCLOSURE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFAMILY COURT COVER SHEET ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • DocketPLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: GORMAN, JEFF T. ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • DocketCASE FILED 04/17/2019 CASE NUMBER 2019DR000995

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • DocketPAYMENT $408.00 RECEIPT #2019000033188 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 88098943 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20190417235959.TXT.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BATTISTA, JEFFREY PAUL