This case was last updated from St. Lucie County Courts on 01/19/2023 at 17:45:04 (UTC).

ASSET ACCEPTANCE LLC vs. SHARP, KENNETH R

Case Summary

On 01/25/2011 ASSET ACCEPTANCE LLC filed an Other lawsuit against SHARP, KENNETH R. This case was filed in St. Lucie County Courts, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WALSH, THOMAS J. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0296

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WALSH, THOMAS J

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ASSET ACCEPTANCE LLC

Defendant

SHARP, KENNETH R

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT < $15,000

1/25/2011: COMPLAINT < $15,000

20 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED:KENNETH R SHARP RET UNEXECUTED

1/25/2011: 20 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED:KENNETH R SHARP RET UNEXECUTED

SUMMONS RETURNED UNEXECUTED

1/31/2011: SUMMONS RETURNED UNEXECUTED

VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL (2DBFH)

5/26/2011: VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL (2DBFH)

 

Docket Entries

09/19/2019

DocketAttorney RODOLFO J MIRO - Deactivated by Automated Process

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/26/2011

DocketDISMISSED BEFORE HEARING

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/26/2011
View Court Documents

DocketVOLUNTARY DISMISSAL (2DBFH)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/31/2011
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS RETURNED UNEXECUTED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/25/2011
View Court Documents

Docket20 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED:KENNETH R SHARP RET UNEXECUTED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/25/2011

DocketSTYLE OF CASE:ASSET ACCEPTANCE LLC VS KENNETH R SHARP

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/25/2011
View Court Documents

DocketCOMPLAINT < $15,000

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/25/2011

DocketSUMMONS ISSUANCE FEE $10

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/25/2011

DocketASSIGNED TO JUDGE WALSH

[+] Read More [-] Read Less