Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 10/27/2020 at 22:26:23 (UTC).

ASI PREFERRED CORP. vs. AIELLO, MICHELLE

Case Summary

On 03/04/2019 ASI PREFERRED CORP filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against AIELLO, MICHELLE. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BRONIS, BARBARA W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0443

  • Filing Date:

    03/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BRONIS, BARBARA W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ASI PREFERRED CORP.

Defendants

BOURNE, RUSSELL

AIELLO, MICHELLE

SAGARASS, CARLYN

AIELLO, ARTHUR JOSEPH

AIELLO, ARTHUR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ATKINSON, JOHN BOND

BUSTAMANTE, TIFFANY ALEXANDRA

Defendant Attorneys

WEISSER, JASON DREW

BLANTON, ROBIN A

KREUSLER-WALSH, JANE

 

Court Documents

MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO MSJ ( V )

12/5/2019: MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO MSJ ( V )

MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ( V )

9/24/2019: MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ( V )

SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

8/9/2019: SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION - AMENDED ( V )

7/17/2019: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION - AMENDED ( V )

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ( V )

6/5/2019: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ( V )

RESPONSE TO REQUEST ADMISSIONS ( V )

5/23/2019: RESPONSE TO REQUEST ADMISSIONS ( V )

RESPONSE TO REQUEST ADMISSIONS ( V )

5/23/2019: RESPONSE TO REQUEST ADMISSIONS ( V )

NOTICE OF HEARING ( V )

5/17/2019: NOTICE OF HEARING ( V )

MOTION TO STRIKE ( V )

5/2/2019: MOTION TO STRIKE ( V )

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

9/14/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

CLERK ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF NEW CASE

5/6/2020: CLERK ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF NEW CASE

ORDER ON MOTION FOR FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFF, ASI

4/2/2020: ORDER ON MOTION FOR FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFF, ASI

NOTICE OF FILING VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ARTHUR AIELLO SR. RE: CASE# 2019CA000948

3/6/2020: NOTICE OF FILING VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ARTHUR AIELLO SR. RE: CASE# 2019CA000948

NOTICE OF HEARING ( V )

1/9/2020: NOTICE OF HEARING ( V )

REPLY ( V )

12/31/2019: REPLY ( V )

NOTICE OF HEARING ( V )

12/13/2019: NOTICE OF HEARING ( V )

NOTICE OF HEARING ( V )

12/13/2019: NOTICE OF HEARING ( V )

NOTICE OF HEARING ( V )

12/6/2019: NOTICE OF HEARING ( V )

71 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • FinancialReceipt #: 2020000042908; Applied Amount; $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: KREUSLER-WALSH, JANE - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2019CA000443, ASI PREFERRED CORP. VS. AIELLO, MICHELLE - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: RECEIPT-6/12/2020"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • DocketPAYMENT $0.00 RECEIPT #2020000042908

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: BLANTON, ROBIN A - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2019CA000443, ASI PREFERRED CORP. VS. AIELLO, MICHELLE - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: NTCPAY-6/3/2020"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: CMOSLEY@BLANTON-LAW.COM; JATKINSON@ATKATTORNEYS.COM; RVARGAS@KWVSAPPEALS.COM; SSERAFIN@KWVSAPPEALS.COM; LINDSAYABB@ATKATTORNEYS.COM WEISSER, JASON DREW; KREUSLER-WALSH, JANE; BLANTON, ROBIN A; ATKINSON, JOHN BOND - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2019CA000443, ASI PREFERRED CORP. VS. AIELLO, MICHELLE - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 2 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: CAIR-6/3/2020,CESVC-6/3/2020"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE FOR PAYMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERKS APPELLATE INDEX/CERTIFICATE

    Read MoreRead Less
92 More Docket Entries
  • 03/05/2019
  • DocketPLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: ATKINSON, JOHN BOND ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • DocketPAYMENT $450.00 RECEIPT #2019000019459 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 85829916 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20190305235959.TXT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • DocketCASE FILED 03/04/2019 CASE NUMBER 2019CA000443

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ASI PREFERRED INSURANCE CORP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bustamante, Tiffany A

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ATKINSON, JOHN BOND