This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 01/02/2021 at 06:15:44 (UTC).

AS MACHAI LLC vs. SYMINS, MATTHEW

Case Summary

On 07/19/2012 AS MACHAI LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against SYMINS, MATTHEW. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2883

  • Filing Date:

    07/19/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AS MACHAI LLC

Defendants

SYMINS, MATTHEW

SYMINS, VANESSA

Not Yet Classified

AS MACHAI LLC C/O AIRAN PACE LAW, P.A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCDONALD, BRADLEY J

 

Court Documents

CERTIFICATE OF SALE

6/6/2013: CERTIFICATE OF SALE

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

3/11/2013: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

AFFIDAVIT OF:RECORD TITLE

10/15/2012: AFFIDAVIT OF:RECORD TITLE

AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS

10/15/2012: AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS

NOTICE

10/15/2012: NOTICE

NTC OF FILING ORIG DOCUMENTS:ORIG NOTE ORIG MORTGAGE

10/10/2012: NTC OF FILING ORIG DOCUMENTS:ORIG NOTE ORIG MORTGAGE

MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

10/10/2012: MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

NOTICE OF E-MAIL DESIGNATION

9/14/2012: NOTICE OF E-MAIL DESIGNATION

COMPLAINT MF VALUE >= 250,000

7/19/2012: COMPLAINT MF VALUE >= 250,000

CERTIFICATE OF NO DISBURSEMENT

7/2/2013: CERTIFICATE OF NO DISBURSEMENT

PROOF OF PUBLICATION

5/31/2013: PROOF OF PUBLICATION

NOTICE OF SALE

3/18/2013: NOTICE OF SALE

CLERK'S NOTES

3/11/2013: CLERK'S NOTES

AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS

12/26/2012: AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS

AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS

11/15/2012: AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS

MOTION FOR CLERK DEFAULT

9/14/2012: MOTION FOR CLERK DEFAULT

NTC OF HEARING

9/7/2012: NTC OF HEARING

CIVIL COVER SHEET

7/19/2012: CIVIL COVER SHEET

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketAttorney BRADLEY J MCDONALD - Deactivated by Automated Process

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF TITLE - Recorded (OR.3534.2872 / 3851374)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF NO DISBURSEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2013
  • HearingEvent: FORECLOSURE SALE; Judge: FORECLOSURE SALE; Location: Jury Room

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF SALE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF TITLE - PROPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2013
  • FinancialReceipt #: 2013000051855; Applied Amount; $70.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2013
  • FinancialReceipt #: 2013000051842; Applied Amount; $0.70

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2013
  • DocketPAYMENT $70.00 RECEIPT #2013000051855

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2013
  • DocketJUDICIAL SALE FORECLOSURES ASSESSED $70.00

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 08/30/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2012
  • FinancialReceipt #: 2012321124411; Applied Amount; $5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2012
  • FinancialReceipt #: 2012321124410; Applied Amount; $1,945.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2012
  • DocketSUMMONS FEE $40.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVALUE FORECLOSURE CLAIM FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNTC OF LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT MF VALUE >= 250,000

    Read MoreRead Less