This case was last updated from St. Lucie County Courts on 11/01/2020 at 14:51:35 (UTC).

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK vs. BISCOLA, SIDNEY L

Case Summary

On 08/13/2019 AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BISCOLA, SIDNEY L. This case was filed in St. Lucie County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ISENHOWER, DARYL. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2951

  • Filing Date:

    08/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ISENHOWER, DARYL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK

Defendant

BISCOLA, SIDNEY L

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MODLIN, SCOTT ERIC

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION - Recorded (Other.4381.1571 / 4673375) ( V )

2/11/2020: STIPULATION - Recorded (Other.4381.1571 / 4673375) ( V )

STIPULATION ( V )

2/7/2020: STIPULATION ( V )

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ( V )

1/27/2020: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ( V )

FINAL JUDGMENT AFTER DEFAULT (GENERAL FORM) ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4369.157 / 4661624) ( V )

1/13/2020: FINAL JUDGMENT AFTER DEFAULT (GENERAL FORM) ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4369.157 / 4661624) ( V )

FINAL JUDGMENT AFTER DEFAULT (GENERAL FORM) ( V )

1/7/2020: FINAL JUDGMENT AFTER DEFAULT (GENERAL FORM) ( V )

AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS ( V )

12/27/2019: AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS ( V )

MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT ( V )

12/27/2019: MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT ( V )

COURT MINUTES ( V )

9/25/2019: COURT MINUTES ( V )

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

8/27/2019: RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

8/13/2019: SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

COMPLAINT ( V )

8/13/2019: COMPLAINT ( V )

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

8/13/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

8/13/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - Recorded (Other.4381.1571 / 4673375) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2020
  • DocketAttorney SCOTT ERIC MODLIN - Deactivated by Automated Process

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT AFTER DEFAULT (GENERAL FORM) ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4369.157 / 4661624) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT AFTER DEFAULT (GENERAL FORM) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF COSTS ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 08/13/2019
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: MODLIN, SCOTT ERIC - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2019SC002951, AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK VS. BISCOLA, SIDNEY L - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: SUMI-8/13/2019"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 09/23/2019 AT 1:30 PM IN L/ , COUNTY JUDGE: ISENHOWER, DARYL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • DocketCOUNTY JUDGE ISENHOWER, DARYL: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • DocketPLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: MODLIN, SCOTT ERIC ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • DocketCASE FILED 08/13/2019 CASE NUMBER 2019SC002951

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • DocketPAYMENT $185.00 RECEIPT #2019000067327 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 94080698 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20190813235959.TXT.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Modlin, Scott Eric