This case was last updated from St. Lucie County - Nineteenth Judicial Circuit Court on 10/25/2020 at 06:26:49 (UTC).

AIG PROPERTY CASUALTY COMPANY vs. BAYVIEW CONSTRUCTION SERVICES LLC

Case Summary

On 01/16/2019 AIG PROPERTY CASUALTY COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against BAYVIEW CONSTRUCTION SERVICES LLC. This case was filed in St. Lucie County - Nineteenth Judicial Circuit Court, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is METZGER, ELIZABETH A. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0101

  • Filing Date:

    01/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

METZGER, ELIZABETH A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AIG PROPERTY CASUALTY COMPANY

Defendants

BAYVIEW CONSTRUCTION SERVICES LLC

HARDWOOD DESIGN, INC.

GL STAFFING SERVICES INC

J A M CUSTOM CARPENTRY LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MAY, ROBERT GALE III

ABRAMENKO, STANISLAV

Defendant Attorneys

SMITH, LAUREN J

RUBIN, JEFFREY KEITH

BUSBY, JENNIFER

KLAGGE, KEVIN D

BROWN, JONATHAN CLAYTON

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION HEARING - BAYVIEW -CROSS NTC ( V )

7/11/2019: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION HEARING - BAYVIEW -CROSS NTC ( V )

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUBPOENA SERVED ( V )

4/25/2019: RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUBPOENA SERVED ( V )

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION ( V )

4/5/2019: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION ( V )

AFFIDAVIT ( V )

4/3/2019: AFFIDAVIT ( V )

SUBPOENA FOR DEPOSITION ( V )

4/5/2019: SUBPOENA FOR DEPOSITION ( V )

REQUEST FOR COPIES ( V )

4/11/2019: REQUEST FOR COPIES ( V )

NOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES ( V )

3/6/2019: NOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES ( V )

REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

3/6/2019: REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

COMPLAINT ( V )

1/16/2019: COMPLAINT ( V )

38 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/25/2019
  • DocketAttorney JENNIFER BUSBY - Deactivated by Automated Process

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • DocketAttorney KEVIN D KLAGGE - Deactivated by Automated Process

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • DocketAttorney STANISLAV ABRAMENKO - Deactivated by Automated Process

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • DocketAttorney LAUREN J SMITH - Deactivated by Automated Process

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • DocketAttorney LAUREN J SMITH - Deactivated by Automated Process

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • DocketAttorney JEFFREY KEITH RUBIN - Deactivated by Automated Process

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • DocketAttorney ROBERT GALE MAY III - Deactivated by Automated Process

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • DocketAttorney JONATHAN CLAYTON BROWN - Deactivated by Automated Process

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - THIRD PARTY CLAIM ( V )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
58 More Docket Entries
  • 01/17/2019
  • FinancialReceipt #: 2019000004785; Applied Amount; $420.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: MAY, ROBERT GALE III - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2019CA000101, AIG PROPERTY CASUALTY COMPANY VS. BAYVIEW CONSTRUCTION SERVICES LLC - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: SUMI-1/16/2019"

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE MIRMAN, LAWRENCE: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT ( V )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • DocketCASE FILED 01/16/2019 CASE NUMBER 2019CA000101

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • DocketPAYMENT $420.00 RECEIPT #2019000004785 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 83449662 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20190116235959.TXT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GL STAFFING SERV INC is a litigant

Latest cases where BAYVIEW CONSTRUCTION SERVICES is a litigant

Latest cases where AIG PROPERTY CASUALTY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ABRAMENKO , STANISLAV