This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 02/10/2020 at 01:24:07 (UTC).

ADVANTAGE PROPERTY MANAGEMENT, LLC vs. EAST LAKE VILLAGE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION INC

Case Summary

On 08/12/2019 ADVANTAGE PROPERTY MANAGEMENT, LLC filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against EAST LAKE VILLAGE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION INC. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is METZGER, ELIZABETH A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1593

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

METZGER, ELIZABETH A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ADVANTAGE PROPERTY MANAGEMENT, LLC

Defendants

HOMEOWNERS' SUB-ASSOCIATION OF EAST LAKE VILLAGE

MORRIS, SONYA

EAST LAKE VILLAGE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION INC

AVANT-GARDE MANAGEMENT LLC

NEWTON, WAYNE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MOORE, ALBERT BURTON II

Defendant Attorneys

LOZEAU, LOUIS E

ENSOR, JACOB

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE ( V )

1/29/2020: NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE ( V )

NOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES ( V )

1/10/2020: NOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES ( V )

NOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES ( V )

1/10/2020: NOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES ( V )

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ( V )

1/10/2020: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ( V )

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME - SONYA MORRIS ( V )

10/15/2019: MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME - SONYA MORRIS ( V )

NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS ( V )

10/15/2019: NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS ( V )

SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

8/12/2019: SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

8/12/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

8/12/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ( V )

1/10/2020: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ( V )

REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

1/10/2020: REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

1/10/2020: REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL ( V )

10/22/2019: ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL ( V )

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME ( V )

9/4/2019: MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME ( V )

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

8/12/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

8/12/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

COMPLAINT ( V )

8/12/2019: COMPLAINT ( V )

CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

8/12/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME - SONYA MORRIS ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • DocketPLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: MOORE, ALBERT BURTON II ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • DocketCASE FILED 08/12/2019 CASE NUMBER 2019CA001593

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • DocketPAYMENT $450.00 RECEIPT #2019000066865 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 94005144 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20190812235959.TXT.

    Read MoreRead Less