This case was last updated from St. Lucie County Courts on 09/02/2021 at 02:21:28 (UTC).

ACORN WELLNESS CENTER LLC vs. DIRECT GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 08/02/2021 ACORN WELLNESS CENTER LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against DIRECT GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in St. Lucie County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ISENHOWER, DARYL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3085

  • Filing Date:

    08/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ISENHOWER, DARYL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ACORN WELLNESS CENTER LLC

Defendant

DIRECT GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SALK, KENNETH BRIAN

Defendant Attorney

ALSAFEER, ISAM JAMAL

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

8/2/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

COMPLAINT ( V )

8/2/2021: COMPLAINT ( V )

RECEIPT ( V )

8/2/2021: RECEIPT ( V )

SUMMONS ISSUED

8/2/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING AVENUE ( V )

8/2/2021: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING AVENUE ( V )

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS ( V )

8/2/2021: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS ( V )

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING ( V )

8/2/2021: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING ( V )

TRANSFERRED CASE PAPERWORK PACKET ( V )

8/2/2021: TRANSFERRED CASE PAPERWORK PACKET ( V )

CLERK ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF NEW CASE

8/2/2021: CLERK ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF NEW CASE

REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

8/3/2021: REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

8/11/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketDEFENDANT ATTORNEY: ALSAFEER, ISAM JAMAL ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • FinancialReceipt #: 2021000060025; Applied Amount; $175.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: SALK, KENNETH BRIAN - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2021SC003085, ACORN WELLNESS CENTER LLC VS. DIRECT GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 2 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: CLACK-8/2/2021,RECEIPT-8/2/2021"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketPAYMENT $175.00 RECEIPT #2021000060025

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF NEW CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSFERRED CASE PAPERWORK PACKET ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING AVENUE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRECEIPT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketPLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: SALK, KENNETH BRIAN ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketCOUNTY JUDGE ISENHOWER, DARYL: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketFILING CLAIM $500 - $2500 ASSESSED $175.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketCASE FILED 08/02/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021SC003085

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ACORN WELLNESS CENTER LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Direct General Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ALSAFEER ISAM J