This case was last updated from St. Lucie County Courts on 11/26/2022 at 05:16:05 (UTC).

ABC CHIROPRACTIC THERAPEUTIC WELLNESS INC vs. ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/27/2022 ABC CHIROPRACTIC THERAPEUTIC WELLNESS INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in St. Lucie County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ISENHOWER, DARYL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3500

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ISENHOWER, DARYL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ABC CHIROPRACTIC THERAPEUTIC WELLNESS INC

Defendant

ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GUDIN, GREGORY EDWARD

Defendant Attorney

LA MONTAGNE, RACHEL M

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

9/26/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

9/26/2022: COMPLAINT

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

9/26/2022: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

SUMMONS ISSUED

9/27/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

9/27/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED

NOTICE- STANDARD INSTRUCTIONS FOR ZOOM HEARING

9/27/2022: NOTICE- STANDARD INSTRUCTIONS FOR ZOOM HEARING

NOTICE OF SERVICE

10/17/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

10/17/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

10/17/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

STIPULATION WAIVING APPEARANCE

10/20/2022: STIPULATION WAIVING APPEARANCE

AGREED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND ORDER EXPEDITED TRACK

10/21/2022: AGREED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND ORDER EXPEDITED TRACK

ORDER INVOKING CIVIL RULE

10/21/2022: ORDER INVOKING CIVIL RULE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

10/27/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

10/27/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

10/27/2022: DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

10/27/2022: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

MOTION TO DISMISS

11/11/2022: MOTION TO DISMISS

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO DISMISS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • HearingEvent: PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE; Judge: ISENHOWER, DARYL; Location: Video-Telephone-Remote; Result: CANCELLED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER INVOKING CIVIL RULE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAGREED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND ORDER EXPEDITED TRACK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION WAIVING APPEARANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 10/24/2022 AT 2:30 PM IN VTR/ , COUNTY JUDGE: ISENHOWER, DARYL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketCOUNTY JUDGE ISENHOWER, DARYL: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketPLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: GUDIN, GREGORY EDWARD ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketCASE FILED 09/27/2022 CASE NUMBER 2022SC003500

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketPAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2022000075647 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 158109093 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20220927235959.TXT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ABC CHIROPRACTIC THERAPEUTIC WELLNESS INC A/A/O SUSAN BERNSTEIN is a litigant

Latest cases where Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LAMONTAGNE , RACHEL M