This case was last updated from St. Johns County - Seventh Judicial Circuit Court on 02/01/2022 at 03:35:07 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. WASHINGTON, JAMES ARNELL JR

Case Summary

On 10/04/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against WASHINGTON, JAMES ARNELL JR. This case was filed in St. Johns County - Seventh Judicial Circuit Court, St. Johns County Circuit Court located in St. Johns, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SMITH, R. LEE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********CFMA

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    St. Johns, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SMITH, R. LEE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

WASHINGTON, JAMES ARNELL JR

 

Court Documents

ARREST REPORT

10/4/2021: ARREST REPORT

 

Docket Entries

10/20/2021

DocketEntry: ANNOUNCEMENT OF NO INFORMATION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/20/2021

DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/20/2021

DocketEntry: PER STATUTE 939.06 - PD APPL/OTHER COSTS SET ASIDE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/20/2021

DocketEntry: SURETY BOND PSE15956 - RELEASED 10/20/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/20/2021

DocketEntry: ANNOUNCEMENT OF NO INFO/NO PETITION SEQ: 1 SAME - (784.045 1A1) AGGRAVATED BATTERY CAUSE BODILY HARM OR DISABILITY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/06/2021

DocketEntry: NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/06/2021

DocketEntry: DEFENSE ATTORNEY: WILLIAMS, TYLER JEFFERY ASSIGNED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/05/2021

DocketEntry: CF PD/INDG APP FEE ASSESSED $50.00 DUE ON 10/12/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/05/2021

DocketEntry: APPLICATION FOR INDIGENT STATUS (APPROVED)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/04/2021

DocketEntry: SURETY BOND PSE15956 POSTED $2,500.00 ISSUED - 10/02/2021 - AGGRAVATED BATTERY CAUSE BODILY HARM OR DISABILITY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/04/2021

DocketEntry: DOMESTIC VIOLENCE NO CONTACT PRETRIAL RELEASE ORDER WITHOUT GLOBAL POSITIONING SYSTEM (GPS) ELECTRONIC MONITORING

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/04/2021

DocketEntry: DEFENSE ATTORNEY: DEFENDER, PUBLIC ASSIGNED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/04/2021

DocketEntry: MARSY'S LAW REQUEST (CHECKED NO)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/04/2021

DocketEntry: FIRST APPEARANCE FORM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/04/2021
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: ARREST REPORT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/04/2021

DocketEntry: PROSECUTOR: OFFICE, STATE ATTORNEY'S ASSIGNED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/04/2021

DocketEntry: JUDGE SMITH, R. LEE: ASSIGNED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/04/2021

DocketEntry: CASE FILED 10/04/2021 CASE NUMBER 21001457CFMA

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/01/2021

DocketEntry: ARREST COUNT: 1 - (784.045 1A1) AGGRAVATED BATTERY CAUSE BODILY HARM OR DISABILITY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less