This case was last updated from St. Johns County Courts on 11/07/2022 at 18:10:36 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. TOWN, GILLIAN LOUISE

Case Summary

On 09/08/2022 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against TOWN, GILLIAN LOUISE. This case was filed in St. Johns County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Johns, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is TINLIN, CHARLES. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********MMMA

  • Filing Date:

    09/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Johns, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

TINLIN, CHARLES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

TOWN, GILLIAN LOUISE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

OFFICE, STATE ATTORNEY'S

Defendant Attorney

QUESENBERRY, SUSANNA SAMIA

 

Court Documents

COMPANION TICKET AGREKSE

9/6/2022: COMPANION TICKET AGREKSE

SURETY BOND PSE21015279 POSTED $500.00 ISSUED - 09/01/2022 - DRIVING WHILE LICENSE CANCELED, SUSPENDED OR REVOKED

9/2/2022: SURETY BOND PSE21015279 POSTED $500.00 ISSUED - 09/01/2022 - DRIVING WHILE LICENSE CANCELED, SUSPENDED OR REVOKED

CITATION FILED: CITATION NUMBER AGREKRE

9/2/2022: CITATION FILED: CITATION NUMBER AGREKRE

SURETY BOND PSE21019506 POSTED $200.00 ISSUED - 09/01/2022 - ATTACHING A TAG NOT ASSIGNED

9/2/2022: SURETY BOND PSE21019506 POSTED $200.00 ISSUED - 09/01/2022 - ATTACHING A TAG NOT ASSIGNED

SURETY BOND PSE21019507 POSTED $500.00 ISSUED - 09/01/2022 - POSSESSION OF PARAPHERNALIA

9/2/2022: SURETY BOND PSE21019507 POSTED $500.00 ISSUED - 09/01/2022 - POSSESSION OF PARAPHERNALIA

SURETY BOND PSE21019508 POSTED $500.00 ISSUED - 09/01/2022 - POSSESSION OF MARIJUANA NOT MORE THAN 20 GRAMS

9/2/2022: SURETY BOND PSE21019508 POSTED $500.00 ISSUED - 09/01/2022 - POSSESSION OF MARIJUANA NOT MORE THAN 20 GRAMS

INFORMATION

9/8/2022: INFORMATION

NOTICE MAILED TO DEFENDANT

9/8/2022: NOTICE MAILED TO DEFENDANT

NOTICE EMAILED TO BOND DEPOSITOR

9/8/2022: NOTICE EMAILED TO BOND DEPOSITOR

ARREST REPORT

9/2/2022: ARREST REPORT

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/29/2022
  • HearingEvent: PRETRIAL-MISDEMEANOR; Judge: TINLIN, CHARLES; Location: Courtroom 216

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • HearingEvent: PRETRIAL-MISDEMEANOR; Judge: TINLIN, CHARLES; Location: Courtroom 216; Result: RESET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE EMAILED TO BOND DEPOSITOR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE MAILED TO DEFENDANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • DocketEntry: PRETRIAL-MISDEMEANOR SET FOR 11/29/2022 AT 1:30 PM IN 216/ , JDG: TINLIN, CHARLES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • DocketEntry: ORDER ON MOTION TO CONTINUE PRETRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • DocketEntry: MOTION TO CONTINUE PRE-TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • HearingEvent: CIT APP MISDEMEANOR; Judge: TINLIN, CHARLES; Location: Courtroom 216; Result: PLEA FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketEntry: CITATION FILED: CITATION NUMBER {{CITATIONNUMBER}}

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketEntry: STATES DISCOVERY EXHIBIT/WITNESS LIST AND DEMAND FOR RECIPROCAL DISCLOSURE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 09/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SURETY BOND PSE21019506 POSTED $200.00 ISSUED - 09/01/2022 - ATTACHING A TAG NOT ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SURETY BOND PSE21015279 POSTED $500.00 ISSUED - 09/01/2022 - DRIVING WHILE LICENSE CANCELED, SUSPENDED OR REVOKED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CITATION FILED: CITATION NUMBER AGREKRE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: ARREST REPORT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • DocketEntry: ADD SENT TO TCATS - AGREKRE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • DocketEntry: ADD SENT TO TCATS - AGREKQE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • DocketEntry: ARREST COUNT: 1 - (322.34 2C) DRIVING WHILE LICENSE CANCELED, SUSPENDED OR REVOKED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • DocketEntry: ARREST COUNT: 2 - (320.261) ATTACHING A TAG NOT ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • DocketEntry: ARREST COUNT: 4 - (893.13 6B) POSSESSION OF MARIJUANA NOT MORE THAN 20 GRAMS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • DocketEntry: ARREST COUNT: 3 - (893.147 1) POSSESSION OF PARAPHERNALIA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less