This case was last updated from St. Johns County Courts on 07/11/2020 at 14:01:41 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. SCHWARTZ, DOUGLAS JAMES

Case Summary

On 07/08/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against SCHWARTZ, DOUGLAS JAMES. This case was filed in St. Johns County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Johns, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is TINLIN, CHARLES. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********MMMA

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    St. Johns County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Johns, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

TINLIN, CHARLES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

SCHWARTZ, DOUGLAS JAMES

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketEntry: COMPLIANCE CREATED : PAY FNE REQUIRED BY: 07/15/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketEntry: COMPLIANCE CREATED : PAY FNE REQUIRED BY: 07/15/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketEntry: COMPLIANCE CREATED : PAY FNE REQUIRED BY: 07/15/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketEntry: COMPLIANCE CREATED : PAY FNE REQUIRED BY: 07/15/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketEntry: JUDGMENT/SENTENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketEntry: FIRST APPEARANCE FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketEntry: ARREST REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketEntry: JUDGE TINLIN, CHARLES: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 07/08/2020 CASE NUMBER 20001090MMMA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2020
  • DocketEntry: CASE# 20001090MMMA - SENTENCED: IMPOSED: 7/5/2020 EFFECTIVE DATE: 7/5/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2020
  • DocketEntry: SENTENCING JUDGE: MALTZ, HOWARD M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2020
  • DocketEntry: CASE# 20001090MMMA - SENTENCED: IMPOSED: 7/5/2020 EFFECTIVE DATE: 7/5/2020 - MAX CONF - CNTY JAIL FOR 10 DAYS - CHRG 001 CREDIT FOR TIME SERVED - 2 DAYS - CHRG 001 -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2020
  • DocketEntry: ADJUDICATED GUILTY SEQ: 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2020
  • DocketEntry: DEFENDANT ENTERED PLEA OF NOLO-CONTENDERE SEQ 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2020
  • DocketEntry: MM COURT COSTS ONLY ASSESSED $223.00 DUE ON 7/15/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2020
  • DocketEntry: MM COST OF PROSEC ST ATTY ASSESSED $50.00 DUE ON 7/15/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2020
  • DocketEntry: MMSAPD COST INV ASSESSED $50.00 DUE ON 7/15/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2020
  • DocketEntry: MM DRUG AND ALC ABUSE ASSESSED $15.00 DUE ON 7/15/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/04/2020
  • DocketEntry: ARREST COUNT: 1 - (856.011) DISORDERLY INTOXICATION

    Read MoreRead Less