This case was last updated from St. Johns County Courts on 07/11/2020 at 14:34:11 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. RUDE, JUDY ANNE

Case Summary

On 07/08/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against RUDE, JUDY ANNE. This case was filed in St. Johns County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Johns, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CHRISTINE, ALEXANDER R JR. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********MMMA

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    St. Johns County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Johns, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CHRISTINE, ALEXANDER R JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

RUDE, JUDY ANNE

 

Court Documents

ARREST REPORT

7/8/2020: ARREST REPORT

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/16/2020
  • HearingEvent: CIT APP MISDEMEANOR; Judge: CHRISTINE, ALEXANDER R JR; Location: Courtroom 255

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketEntry: CIT APP MISDEMEANOR SET FOR 07/16/2020 AT 1:30 PM IN 255/ , JDG: CHRISTINE, ALEXANDER R JR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketEntry: FIRST APPEARANCE FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: ARREST REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketEntry: JUDGE CHRISTINE, ALEXANDER R JR: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 07/08/2020 CASE NUMBER 20001091MMMA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketEntry: ARREST COUNT: 1 - (810.09 1 2A) TRESPASS ON PROPERTY OTHER THAN STRUCTURE OR CONVE

    Read MoreRead Less