This case was last updated from St. Johns County - Seventh Judicial Circuit Court on 01/26/2023 at 12:07:56 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. MEEKS, DIVINE DESTINY

Case Summary

On 03/31/2022 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against MEEKS, DIVINE DESTINY. This case was filed in St. Johns County - Seventh Judicial Circuit Court, St. Johns County Circuit Court located in St. Johns, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SMITH, R. LEE and ZAMBRANO, RAUL A. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********CFMA

  • Filing Date:

    03/31/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    St. Johns, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SMITH, R. LEE

ZAMBRANO, RAUL A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

MEEKS, DIVINE DESTINY

 

Court Documents

SURETY BOND AA22749387 POSTED $1,500.00 ISSUED - 03/31/2022 - GRAND THEFT

4/1/2022: SURETY BOND AA22749387 POSTED $1,500.00 ISSUED - 03/31/2022 - GRAND THEFT

ARREST REPORT

3/31/2022: ARREST REPORT

INFORMATION

4/7/2022: INFORMATION

 

Docket Entries

10/25/2022

DocketEntry: PAYMENT $48.48 RECEIPT #2022039768

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/13/2022

DocketEntry: REOPENED CASE CLOSED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/11/2022

HearingEvent: FELONY PRETRIAL; Judge: ZAMBRANO, RAUL A; Location: Courtroom 264; Result: COMPLETED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/11/2022

DocketEntry: =PTI REINSTATED /ALLOWED CONTACT WITH SISTER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/22/2022

DocketEntry: PRETRIAL INTERVENTION PROGRAM STATUS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/22/2022

DocketEntry: NOTICE EMAILED TO ATTORNEY (DEFENDANT)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/22/2022

DocketEntry: NOTICE MAILED TO DEFENDANT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/22/2022

DocketEntry: SAO COURT DATE REQUEST

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/22/2022

DocketEntry: FELONY PRETRIAL SET FOR 07/11/2022 AT 9:00 AM IN 328/ , JDG: SMITH, R. LEE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/22/2022

DocketEntry: CASE REOPENED FOR OTHER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
45 More Docket Entries
03/31/2022

DocketEntry: CF PD/INDG APP FEE ASSESSED $50.00 DUE ON 7/17/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/31/2022

DocketEntry: APPLICATION FOR INDIGENT STATUS (APPROVED)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/31/2022

DocketEntry: MARSY'S LAW REQUEST

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/31/2022

DocketEntry: DEFENSE ATTORNEY: DEFENDER, PUBLIC ASSIGNED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/31/2022

DocketEntry: FIRST APPEARANCE FORM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/31/2022
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: ARREST REPORT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/31/2022

DocketEntry: PROSECUTOR: OFFICE, STATE ATTORNEY'S ASSIGNED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/31/2022

DocketEntry: JUDGE SMITH, R. LEE: ASSIGNED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/31/2022

DocketEntry: CASE FILED 03/31/2022 CASE NUMBER 22000503CFMA

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/30/2022

DocketEntry: ARREST COUNT: 1 - (812.014 2C1) GRAND THEFT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less