This case was last updated from St. Johns County Courts on 07/11/2020 at 14:02:08 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. GIBBS, RANDY DEL

Case Summary

On 07/08/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against GIBBS, RANDY DEL. This case was filed in St. Johns County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Johns, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CHRISTINE, ALEXANDER R JR. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********MMMA

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    St. Johns County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Johns, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CHRISTINE, ALEXANDER R JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

GIBBS, RANDY DEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

FERGUSON, JALISA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/30/2020
  • HearingEvent: CIT APP MISDEMEANOR; Judge: CHRISTINE, ALEXANDER R JR; Location: Courtroom 255

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • HearingEvent: CIT APP MISDEMEANOR; Judge: CHRISTINE, ALEXANDER R JR; Location: Courtroom 255; Result: RESET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE MAILED TO DEFENDANT, EMAILED TO BOND DEPOSITOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • DocketEntry: CIT APP MISDEMEANOR SET FOR 07/30/2020 AT 1:30 PM IN 255/ , JDG: CHRISTINE, ALEXANDER R JR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • DocketEntry: SURETY BOND PSE228409 POSTED $1,500.00 ISSUED - 07/08/2020 - PRE TRIAL RELEASE COND VIOL FOR DOMEST VIOL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketEntry: APPLICATION FOR INDIGENT STATUS (APPROVED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketEntry: MM PD/INDG APP FEE ASSESSED $50.00 DUE ON 7/15/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketEntry: COMPLIANCE CREATED : PUBLIC DEFENDER FEE REQUIRED BY: 07/15/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketEntry: DEFENSE ATTORNEY: FERGUSON, JALISA ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketEntry: CIT APP MISDEMEANOR SET FOR 07/16/2020 AT 1:30 PM IN 255/ , JDG: CHRISTINE, ALEXANDER R JR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketEntry: EMAIL FROM JUDGE RE: FIRST APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketEntry: FIRST APPEARANCE FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketEntry: DOMESTIC VIOLENCE NO CONTACT PRETRIAL RELEASE ORDER WITH GLOBAL POSITIONING SYSTEM (GPS) ELECTRONIC MONITORING - NOT SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketEntry: ARREST REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketEntry: JUDGE CHRISTINE, ALEXANDER R JR: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 07/08/2020 CASE NUMBER 20001089MMMA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketEntry: ARREST COUNT: 1 - (741.29 6) PRE TRIAL RELEASE COND VIOL FOR DOMEST VIOL

    Read MoreRead Less