This case was last updated from St. Johns County Courts on 01/22/2023 at 02:27:53 (UTC).

WSFS, FSB, AS TRUSTEE FOR CVI AMR INVESTMENT TRUST vs. HARRIS, JEFFERY

Case Summary

On 12/08/2022 WSFS, FSB, AS TRUSTEE FOR CVI AMR INVESTMENT TRUST filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against HARRIS, JEFFERY. This case was filed in St. Johns County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Johns, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CHRISTINE, ALEXANDER R JR. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****4151

  • Filing Date:

    12/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Johns, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CHRISTINE, ALEXANDER R JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WSFS, FSB, AS TRUSTEE FOR CVI AMR INVESTMENT TRUST

Defendant

HARRIS, JEFFERY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ANDREU, JUAN G

 

Court Documents

PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 12/09/2022 FOR HARRIS, JEFFERY

12/9/2022: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 12/09/2022 FOR HARRIS, JEFFERY

COMPLAINT

12/8/2022: COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/20/2023
  • HearingEvent: PRETRIAL HEARING (SP/CC); Judge: CHRISTINE, ALEXANDER R JR; Location: Courtroom 216; Result: CANCELLED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketEntry: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED ON 12/31/2022 FOR HARRIS, JEFFERY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2022045991

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 12/09/2022 FOR HARRIS, JEFFERY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • DocketEntry: PRETRIAL HEARING (SP/CC) SET FOR 01/20/2023 AT 2:00 PM IN 216/ , JDG: CHRISTINE, ALEXANDER R JR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • DocketEntry: ATTORNEY: ANDREU, JUAN G ASSIGNED TO WSFS, FSB, AS TRUSTEE FOR CVI AMR INVESTMENT TRUST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • DocketEntry: JUDGE CHRISTINE, ALEXANDER R JR: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 12/08/2022 CASE NUMBER SP22-4151

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less