Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from St. Johns County Courts on 02/03/2021 at 09:13:10 (UTC).

WOODY, NANCY vs. LINCOLN BENEFIT LIFE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/29/2020 WOODY, NANCY filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against LINCOLN BENEFIT LIFE COMPANY. This case was filed in St. Johns County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Johns, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SMITH, R. LEE and MALTZ, HOWARD M.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0115

  • Filing Date:

    01/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    St. Johns County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Johns, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SMITH, R. LEE

MALTZ, HOWARD M.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WOODY, NANCY

Defendant

LINCOLN BENEFIT LIFE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KENNON, HANS

Defendant Attorney

BEHAR, AARON

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

1/28/2020: COMPLAINT

CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 01/29/2020 FOR LINCOLN BENEFIT LIFE COMPANY

1/29/2020: CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 01/29/2020 FOR LINCOLN BENEFIT LIFE COMPANY

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketEntry: JUDGE MALTZ, HOWARD M.: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF INDEPENDENT MEDICAL EXAMINATION OF PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF FILING #109065192

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF INDEPENDENT MEDIATION EXAMINATION OF PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANT'S RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketEntry: DEFENDANT, LINCOLN BENEFIT LIFE COMPANY'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketEntry: AMENDED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketEntry: ATTORNEY: BEHAR, AARON ASSIGNED TO LINCOLN BENEFIT LIFE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketEntry: DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES PURSUANT TO F.R.J.A. 2.516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE BY BEHARBEHAR OB BEHALF OF DEFENDANT, LINCOLN BENEFIT LIFE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketEntry: ORDER UPON FILING (JUDGE SMITH STANDING ORDER DTD 01/09/19 RE: ALL CIVIL CASES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 01/29/2020 FOR LINCOLN BENEFIT LIFE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketEntry: ATTORNEY: KENNON, HANS ASSIGNED TO WOODY, NANCY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketEntry: JUDGE SMITH, R. LEE: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 01/29/2020 CASE NUMBER CA20-0115

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketEntry: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 2.613 AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketEntry: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Lincoln Benefit Life Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KENNON HANS