This case was last updated from St. Johns County - Seventh Judicial Circuit Court on 05/02/2023 at 19:08:21 (UTC).

WHITE, CLIFFORD vs. STATE FARM FLORIDA INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 02/01/2023 WHITE, CLIFFORD filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against STATE FARM FLORIDA INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in St. Johns County - Seventh Judicial Circuit Court, St. Johns County Circuit Court located in St. Johns, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JANESK, KENNETH J. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0137

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    St. Johns, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JANESK, KENNETH J

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

WHITE, CLIFFORD

WHITE, BRENNA

Defendant

STATE FARM FLORIDA INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ZANAKOS, CHRISTINA NICOLE

Defendant Attorneys

1 PACKER, MICHAEL A

2 ALTMAN, SETH B

3 MACKEY, JOSEPH WILLIAM

 

Court Documents

DEFENDANT'S RESPONSES AND OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS' FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

4/25/2023: DEFENDANT'S RESPONSES AND OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS' FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF DEFENDANT'S DESIGNATED CORPORATE REPRESENTATIVE PURSUANT TO FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 1.310(B)(6)

4/25/2023: PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF DEFENDANT'S DESIGNATED CORPORATE REPRESENTATIVE PURSUANT TO FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 1.310(B)(6)

AGREED ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME RESPOND TO DEFENDANT'S DISCOVERY REQUEST

4/21/2023: AGREED ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME RESPOND TO DEFENDANT'S DISCOVERY REQUEST

DEFENDANT,STATE FARM FLORIDA INSURANCE COMPANYS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF OBJECTIONS AND VERIFIED ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES

4/19/2023: DEFENDANT,STATE FARM FLORIDA INSURANCE COMPANYS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF OBJECTIONS AND VERIFIED ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES

DEFENDANT, STATE FARM CASUALTY COMPANYS OBJECTIONS AND RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

4/19/2023: DEFENDANT, STATE FARM CASUALTY COMPANYS OBJECTIONS AND RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANT'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

4/12/2023: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANT'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

AGREED ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND AND OBJECT TO PLAINTIFF'S DISCOVERY

3/29/2023: AGREED ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND AND OBJECT TO PLAINTIFF'S DISCOVERY

DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND AND OBJECT TO PLAINTIFFS' DISCOVERY

3/20/2023: DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND AND OBJECT TO PLAINTIFFS' DISCOVERY

DEFENDANTS FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO PLAINTIFFS

3/15/2023: DEFENDANTS FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO PLAINTIFFS

DEFENDANT, STATE FARM FLORIDA INSURANCE COMPANYS, REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLAINTIFFS

3/15/2023: DEFENDANT, STATE FARM FLORIDA INSURANCE COMPANYS, REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLAINTIFFS

DEFENDANT, STATE FARM FLORIDA INSURANCE COMPANYS, NOTICE OF SERVICE OF FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFFS

3/15/2023: DEFENDANT, STATE FARM FLORIDA INSURANCE COMPANYS, NOTICE OF SERVICE OF FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFFS

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

3/15/2023: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

DEFENDANT, STATE FARM FLORIDA INSURANCE COMPANY'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO AMENDED COMPLAINT

3/10/2023: DEFENDANT, STATE FARM FLORIDA INSURANCE COMPANY'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO AMENDED COMPLAINT

AMENDED COMPLAINT

2/28/2023: AMENDED COMPLAINT

DEFENDANT, STATE FARM FLORIDA INSURANCE COMPANY'S MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION

2/23/2023: DEFENDANT, STATE FARM FLORIDA INSURANCE COMPANY'S MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION

PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2023004459

2/3/2023: PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2023004459

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 2.516

2/17/2023: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 2.516

NOTICE OF FILING - CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER DATED FEBRUARY 1, 2023

2/15/2023: NOTICE OF FILING - CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER DATED FEBRUARY 1, 2023

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: DEFENDANT'S RESPONSES AND OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS' FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF DEFENDANT'S DESIGNATED CORPORATE REPRESENTATIVE PURSUANT TO FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 1.310(B)(6)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2023
  • DocketEntry: EMAIL SENT TO: ZANAKOS, CHRISTINA NICOLE; ALTMAN, SETH B; PACKER, MICHAEL A; MACKEY, JOSEPH WILLIAM REGARDING SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT CA23-0137, WHITE, CLIFFORD VS. STATE FARM FLORIDA INSURANCE COMPANY WITH 1 ATTACHMENTS FROM DOCKET: AGREED ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME RESPOND TO DEFENDANT'S DISCOVERY REQUEST-4/21/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: AGREED ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME RESPOND TO DEFENDANT'S DISCOVERY REQUEST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2023
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: DEFENDANT,STATE FARM FLORIDA INSURANCE COMPANYS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF OBJECTIONS AND VERIFIED ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: DEFENDANT, STATE FARM CASUALTY COMPANYS OBJECTIONS AND RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANT'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2023
  • DocketEntry: EMAIL SENT TO: ZANAKOS, CHRISTINA NICOLE; ALTMAN, SETH B; PACKER, MICHAEL A; MACKEY, JOSEPH WILLIAM REGARDING SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT CA23-0137, WHITE, CLIFFORD VS. STATE FARM FLORIDA INSURANCE COMPANY WITH 1 ATTACHMENTS FROM DOCKET: AGREED ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND AND OBJECT TO PLAINTIFF'S DISCOVERY-3/29/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: AGREED ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND AND OBJECT TO PLAINTIFF'S DISCOVERY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketEntry: ATTORNEY: ZANAKOS, CHRISTINA NICOLE ASSIGNED TO WHITE, BRENNA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 02/01/2023 FOR STATE FARM FLORIDA INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketEntry: ATTORNEY: ZANAKOS, CHRISTINA NICOLE ASSIGNED TO WHITE, CLIFFORD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketEntry: JUDGE JANESK, KENNETH J: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 02/01/2023 CASE NUMBER CA23-0137

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PLAINTIFFSFIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PLAINTIFFS' FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less