This case was last updated from St. Johns County Courts on 02/06/2021 at 12:14:42 (UTC).

WELCH, ELIZABETH vs. UNITED PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 05/28/2020 WELCH, ELIZABETH filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against UNITED PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in St. Johns County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Johns, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SMITH, R. LEE and MALTZ, HOWARD M.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0597

  • Filing Date:

    05/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Johns, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SMITH, R. LEE

MALTZ, HOWARD M.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

WELCH, RONALD

WELCH, ELIZABETH

Defendant

UNITED PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ROBERTSON, PETER A

HUNT, DAMIAN BROWN

KEYES, TERENCE P

BENNETT, JACKLYN G

Defendant Attorneys

JONES, GREGORY DAVID

SABBAGH, CARLA M

 

Court Documents

5/29/2020

12: 5/29/2020

6/4/2020

13: 6/4/2020

7/20/2020

18: 7/20/2020

7/21/2020

20: 7/21/2020

7/27/2020

21: 7/27/2020

9/17/2020

29: 9/17/2020

2/21/2021

38: 2/21/2021

2/21/2021

39: 2/21/2021

2/21/2021

40: 2/21/2021

4/8/2021

41: 4/8/2021

4/8/2021

42: 4/8/2021

4/8/2021

43: 4/8/2021

4/8/2021

44: 4/8/2021

4/12/2021

46: 4/12/2021

7/2/2021

47: 7/2/2021

8/5/2021

53: 8/5/2021

NOTICE FOR TRIAL

10/9/2020: NOTICE FOR TRIAL

ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S UNOPPOSED MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT

8/28/2020: ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S UNOPPOSED MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT

0 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/01/2021
  • HearingEvent: CIVIL DOCKET SOUNDING; Judge: MALTZ, HOWARD M.; Location: Zoom

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF LAW FIRM NAME AND AFFILIATION AND AMENDED DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketEntry: JUDGE MALTZ, HOWARD M.: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketEntry: EMAIL SENT TO: HUNT, DAMIAN; SABBAGH, CARLA; JONES, GREGORY DAVID; STANFORD, WILLIAM DOUGLAS JR; BENNETT, JACKLYN REGARDING SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT CA20-0597, WELCH, ELIZABETH VS. UNITED PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY WITH 1 ATTACHMENTS FROM DOCKET: ORDER SCHEDULING JURY TRIAL-10/16/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketEntry: ORDER SCHEDULING JURY TRIAL AND DIRECTING PRETRIAL PROCEDURE - DOCKET SOUNDING SET FOR 11/01/2021 AT 1:30PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketEntry: EMAIL SENT TO: JUDICIAL ASSISTANT TRACI DAVIS REGARDING SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT CA20-0597, WELCH, ELIZABETH VS. UNITED PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY WITH 1 ATTACHMENTS FROM DOCKET: NOTICE FOR TRIAL-10/9/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE FOR TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketEntry: ATTORNEY: SABBAGH, CARLA M ASSIGNED TO UNITED PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketEntry: UNITED PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY'S ANSWER , AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketEntry: EMAIL SENT TO: BENNETT, JACKLYN REGARDING SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT CA20-0597, WELCH, ELIZABETH VS. UNITED PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY -AGREED ORDER ON JOINT MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL-9/3/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketEntry: ORDER UPON FILING (JUDGE SMITH STANDING ORDER DTD 01/09/19 RE: ALL CIVIL CASES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 05/28/2020 FOR UNITED PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketEntry: ATTORNEY: HUNT, DAMIAN BROWN ASSIGNED TO WELCH, RONALD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketEntry: ATTORNEY: HUNT, DAMIAN BROWN ASSIGNED TO WELCH, ELIZABETH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketEntry: ATTORNEY: ROBERTSON, PETER A ASSIGNED TO WELCH, RONALD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketEntry: ATTORNEY: ROBERTSON, PETER A ASSIGNED TO WELCH, ELIZABETH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketEntry: JUDGE SMITH, R. LEE: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 05/28/2020 CASE NUMBER CA20-0597

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United Property & Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KEYES, TERENCE P

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BENNETT, JACKLYN G

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HUNT, DAMIAN BROWN