Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from St. Johns County Courts on 02/25/2020 at 05:37:18 (UTC).

WELCH, CASEY vs. FLAGLER COLLEGE, INC.

Case Summary

On 12/27/2017 WELCH, CASEY filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against FLAGLER COLLEGE, INC. This case was filed in St. Johns County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Johns, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are TRAYNOR, J MICHAEL and SMITH, R. LEE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1399

  • Filing Date:

    12/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    St. Johns County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Johns, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

TRAYNOR, J MICHAEL

SMITH, R. LEE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WELCH, CASEY

Defendant

FLAGLER COLLEGE, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FRIEDMAN, JEREMY D

Defendant Attorneys

SPELLMAN, MICHAEL P

SNIFFEN, ROBERT J

HERRING, MITCHELL JOHANN

FOUNTAIN, LISA BARCLAY

 

Court Documents

RE-NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM \ JENNIFER MELVIN

1/21/2020: RE-NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM \ JENNIFER MELVIN

RE-NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM \ JENNIFER MELVIN

1/9/2020: RE-NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM \ JENNIFER MELVIN

NOTICE OF HEARING - FEBRUARY 6, 2020 @ 10:30 A.M.

12/4/2019: NOTICE OF HEARING - FEBRUARY 6, 2020 @ 10:30 A.M.

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM - JENNIFER MELVIN

11/25/2019: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM - JENNIFER MELVIN

DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO DEPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF

11/6/2019: DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO DEPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF

AGREED ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO AMEND AMENDED COMPLAINT

9/13/2019: AGREED ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO AMEND AMENDED COMPLAINT

DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

9/6/2019: DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO AMEND AMENDED COMPLAINT

9/6/2019: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO AMEND AMENDED COMPLAINT

DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF

6/7/2019: DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF MARVIN KROHN

5/14/2019: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF MARVIN KROHN

DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF

5/7/2019: DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF

AMENDED COMPLAINT

4/22/2019: AMENDED COMPLAINT

PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO AMEND COMPLAINT / AMENDED COMPLAINT

4/2/2019: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO AMEND COMPLAINT / AMENDED COMPLAINT

SECOND RE-NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM \ CORPORATE REPRESENTATIVE OF FLAGLER COLLEGE, INC.

3/29/2019: SECOND RE-NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM \ CORPORATE REPRESENTATIVE OF FLAGLER COLLEGE, INC.

RE-NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM \ CORPORATE REPRESENTATIVE OF FLAGLER COLLEGE, INC.

3/27/2019: RE-NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM \ CORPORATE REPRESENTATIVE OF FLAGLER COLLEGE, INC.

DEFENDANT'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

3/5/2018: DEFENDANT'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO SUMMONS ISSUED ON 12/28/2017 FOR FLAGLER COLLEGE, INC.

12/28/2017: CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO SUMMONS ISSUED ON 12/28/2017 FOR FLAGLER COLLEGE, INC.

COMPLAINT

12/22/2017: COMPLAINT

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT FROM FEBRUARY 6, 2020 HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketEntry: ATTORNEY: FOUNTAIN, LISA BARCLAY ASSIGNED TO FLAGLER COLLEGE, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • HearingEvent: HEARING (CIVIL); Judge: SMITH, R. LEE; Location: Chambers; Result: COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COURT NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketEntry: SUBPOENA FOR DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM SERVED ON 12/12/2019 ON JENNIFER MELVIN SUBSTITUTE TO JAMES SPARKMAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: RE-NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM \ JENNIFER MELVIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO THE DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS COUNTS VI AND VII OF PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT AND MOTION TO STRIKE IMMATERIAL ALLEGATIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
86 More Docket Entries
  • 12/29/2017
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2017042529

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • DocketEntry: CA/DR SUMMONS ASSESSED $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO SUMMONS ISSUED ON 12/28/2017 FOR FLAGLER COLLEGE, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • DocketEntry: ORDER UPON FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • DocketEntry: ATTORNEY: FRIEDMAN, JEREMY D ASSIGNED TO WELCH, CASEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • DocketEntry: JUDGE TRAYNOR, J MICHAEL: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2017
  • DocketEntry: CONTRACT AND INDEBTNESS ASSESSED $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2017
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 12/27/2017 CASE NUMBER CA17-1399

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SNIFFEN, ROBERT J