Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from St. Johns County Courts on 02/18/2020 at 20:21:54 (UTC).

WARD, DAVID vs. OLYMPUS INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 04/03/2017 WARD, DAVID filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against OLYMPUS INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in St. Johns County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Johns, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is TRAYNOR, J MICHAEL. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0355

  • Filing Date:

    04/03/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    St. Johns County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Johns, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

TRAYNOR, J MICHAEL

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

WARD, JOYCE

WARD, DAVID

Defendant

OLYMPUS INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEWIS, ADAM MICHAEL

Defendant Attorney

GUTTERMAN, MARC J

 

Court Documents

CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO SUMMONS ISSUED ON 04/03/2017 FOR OLYMPUS INSURANCE COMPANY

4/3/2017: CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO SUMMONS ISSUED ON 04/03/2017 FOR OLYMPUS INSURANCE COMPANY

COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

3/31/2017: COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/09/2018
  • HearingEvent: CIVIL DOCKET SOUNDING; Judge: TRAYNOR, J MICHAEL; Location: Courtroom 316; Result: CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2017
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - Recorded (OR.4473.750 / 2017082819)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2017
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2017
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • DocketEntry: DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2017
  • DocketEntry: PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • DocketEntry: EMAIL SENT TO: GUTTERMAN, MARC J; LEWIS, ADAM MICHAEL; FEINTUCH, SETH J REGARDING SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT CA17-0355, WARD, DAVID VS. OLYMPUS INSURANCE COMPANY WITH 1 ATTACHMENTS FROM DOCKET: ORDER SCHEDULING JURY TRIAL-9/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • DocketEntry: ORDER SCHEDULING JURY TRIAL AND DIRECTING PRETRIAL PROCEDURE - DOCKET SOUNDING SET FOR APRIL 9, 2018 AT 1:30PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS DESIGNATION

    Read MoreRead Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 04/03/2017
  • DocketEntry: CONTRACT AND INDEBTNESS ASSESSED $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO SUMMONS ISSUED ON 04/03/2017 FOR OLYMPUS INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • DocketEntry: ATTORNEY: LEWIS, ADAM MICHAEL ASSIGNED TO WARD, DAVID

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • DocketEntry: JUDGE TRAYNOR, J MICHAEL: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 04/03/2017 CASE NUMBER CA17-0355

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2017
  • DocketEntry: COVER LETTER TO CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2017
  • DocketEntry: PLAINTIFF, DAVID WARD'S, NOTICE OF SERVING FIRST INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2017
  • DocketEntry: PLAINTIFFS' FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2017
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Olympus Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gutterman, Marc Jason