This case was last updated from St. Johns County Courts on 03/03/2023 at 00:59:24 (UTC).

WALDEN CHASE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC vs. SEARCY, JILL

Case Summary

On 09/23/2022 WALDEN CHASE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against SEARCY, JILL. This case was filed in St. Johns County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Johns, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CHRISTINE, ALEXANDER R JR. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****3165

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Johns, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CHRISTINE, ALEXANDER R JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WALDEN CHASE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

Defendants

SEARCY, JILL

SEARCY, GEORGE

UNKNOWN TENANT ONE

UNKNOWN TENANT TWO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MATTINGLY, KARENA JOY

 

Court Documents

PERSONAL/INDIVIDUAL SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 09/23/2022 FOR SEARCY, JILL

9/23/2022: PERSONAL/INDIVIDUAL SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 09/23/2022 FOR SEARCY, JILL

PERSONAL/INDIVIDUAL SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 09/23/2022 FOR SEARCY, GEORGE

9/23/2022: PERSONAL/INDIVIDUAL SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 09/23/2022 FOR SEARCY, GEORGE

PERSONAL/INDIVIDUAL SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 09/23/2022 FOR UNKNOWN TENANT ONE

9/23/2022: PERSONAL/INDIVIDUAL SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 09/23/2022 FOR UNKNOWN TENANT ONE

PERSONAL/INDIVIDUAL SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 09/23/2022 FOR UNKNOWN TENANT TWO

9/23/2022: PERSONAL/INDIVIDUAL SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 09/23/2022 FOR UNKNOWN TENANT TWO

COMPLAINT

9/23/2022: COMPLAINT

AOSC20-23 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

9/23/2022: AOSC20-23 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS - RECORDED (OR.5639.1517. / 2022091260)

9/26/2022: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS - RECORDED (OR.5639.1517. / 2022091260)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/20/2023
  • DocketEntry: ORDER RATIFYING STIPULATION FOR SETTLEMENT - RECORDED (OR.5711.310. / 2023012924)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2023
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2023
  • DocketEntry: EMAIL SENT TO: MATTINGLY, KARENA JOY REGARDING SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT CC22-3165, WALDEN CHASE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC VS. SEARCY, JILL WITH 1 ATTACHMENTS FROM DOCKET: ORDER RATIFYING STIPULATION FOR SETTLEMENT-2/20/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2023
  • DocketEntry: ORDER RATIFYING STIPULATION FOR SETTLEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2023
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF FILING STIPULATION FOR SETTLEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • DocketEntry: PERSONAL/INDIVIDUAL SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED ON 10/07/2022 FOR UNKNOWN TENANT TWO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • DocketEntry: PERSONAL/INDIVIDUAL SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON 10/17/2022 FOR UNKNOWN TENANT ONE - INDIVIDUAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • DocketEntry: PERSONAL/INDIVIDUAL SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON 10/17/2022 FOR SEARCY, JILL - SUBSTITUTE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • DocketEntry: PERSONAL/INDIVIDUAL SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON 10/17/2022 FOR SEARCY, GEORGE - SUBSTITUTE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • DocketEntry: EMAIL SENT TO: G SEARCY REGARDING SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT CC22-3165, WALDEN CHASE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC VS. SEARCY, JILL WITH 2 ATTACHMENTS FROM DOCKET: COMPLAINT -9/23/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 09/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PERSONAL/INDIVIDUAL SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 09/23/2022 FOR SEARCY, JILL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • DocketEntry: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • DocketEntry: ATTORNEY: MATTINGLY, KARENA JOY ASSIGNED TO WALDEN CHASE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • DocketEntry: JUDGE CHRISTINE, ALEXANDER R JR: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 09/23/2022 CASE NUMBER CC22-3165

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less