This case was last updated from St. Johns County - Seventh Judicial Circuit Court on 11/28/2021 at 11:48:33 (UTC).

WALDEN CHASE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC vs. PADGETT, BROOKE

Case Summary

On 11/17/2020 WALDEN CHASE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against PADGETT, BROOKE. This case was filed in St. Johns County - Seventh Judicial Circuit Court, St. Johns County Circuit Court located in St. Johns, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MALTZ, HOWARD M.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1217

  • Filing Date:

    11/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    St. Johns, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MALTZ, HOWARD M.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WALDEN CHASE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

Defendant

PADGETT, BROOKE

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL - Recorded (OR.5274.1552 / 2021059096)

5/26/2021: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL - Recorded (OR.5274.1552 / 2021059096)

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

5/25/2021: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

5/25/2021: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

ORDER SCHEDULING NON-JURY TRIAL AND DIRECTING PRETRIAL PROCEDURE - DOCKET SOUNDING ON AUGUST 9, 2021, AT 1:30 PM

4/14/2021: ORDER SCHEDULING NON-JURY TRIAL AND DIRECTING PRETRIAL PROCEDURE - DOCKET SOUNDING ON AUGUST 9, 2021, AT 1:30 PM

ORDER OF CASE MANAGEMENT (FORECLOSURE/CIVIL CASES)

4/14/2021: ORDER OF CASE MANAGEMENT (FORECLOSURE/CIVIL CASES)

PLAINTIFF'S REPLY TO DEFENDANT'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

4/7/2021: PLAINTIFF'S REPLY TO DEFENDANT'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

DEFENDANT'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

3/18/2021: DEFENDANT'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ORDER SCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

2/26/2021: CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ORDER SCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT

2/26/2021: ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/09/2021
  • HearingEvent: CIVIL DOCKET SOUNDING; Judge: MALTZ, HOWARD M.; Location: Zoom; Result: CANCELLED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL - Recorded (OR.5274.1552 / 2021059096)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • HearingEvent: CASE MANAGEMENT (FORECLOSURE); Judge: MALTZ, HOWARD M.; Location: Zoom; Result: COMPLETED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketEntry: EMAIL SENT TO: MCDOWELL, BRANDON RAY; PADGETT, BROOKE REGARDING SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT CA20-1217, WALDEN CHASE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC VS. PADGETT, BROOKE WITH 1 ATTACHMENTS FROM DOCKET: ORDER SCHEDULING NON-JURY TRIAL AND DIRECTING PRETRIAL PROCEDURE - DOCKET SOUNDING ON AUGUST 9, 2021, AT 1:30 PM -4/14/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: ORDER SCHEDULING NON-JURY TRIAL AND DIRECTING PRETRIAL PROCEDURE - DOCKET SOUNDING ON AUGUST 9, 2021, AT 1:30 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketEntry: EMAIL SENT TO: MCDOWELL, BRANDON RAY; PADGETT, BROOKE REGARDING SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT CA20-1217, WALDEN CHASE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC VS. PADGETT, BROOKE WITH 1 ATTACHMENTS FROM DOCKET: ORDER OF CASE MANAGEMENT (FORECLOSURE/CIVIL CASES)-4/14/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: ORDER OF CASE MANAGEMENT (FORECLOSURE/CIVIL CASES)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2020030827

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES IN DIVISION 55

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PERSONAL/INDIVIDUAL SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 11/17/2020 FOR PADGETT, BROOKE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketEntry: ATTORNEY: MCDOWELL, BRANDON RAY ASSIGNED TO WALDEN CHASE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketEntry: JUDGE MALTZ, HOWARD M.: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 11/17/2020 CASE NUMBER CA20-1217

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less