This case was last updated from St. Johns County - Seventh Judicial Circuit Court on 11/28/2021 at 07:00:41 (UTC).

WALDEN CHASE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC vs. KINDER, JAMES

Case Summary

On 10/27/2020 WALDEN CHASE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against KINDER, JAMES. This case was filed in St. Johns County - Seventh Judicial Circuit Court, St. Johns County Circuit Court located in St. Johns, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MALTZ, HOWARD M.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1145

  • Filing Date:

    10/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    St. Johns, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MALTZ, HOWARD M.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WALDEN CHASE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

Defendants

KINDER, ELIZABETH

KINDER, JAMES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCDOWELL, BRANDON RAY

Defendant Attorney

ERTL, CHRISTENE MIELE

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

10/26/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET

CIVIL COVER SHEET

10/26/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET

VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR SPECIFIC PERFORMANCE

10/26/2020: VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR SPECIFIC PERFORMANCE

NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

10/26/2020: NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

PERSONAL/INDIVIDUAL SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 10/27/2020 FOR KINDER, JAMES

10/27/2020: PERSONAL/INDIVIDUAL SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 10/27/2020 FOR KINDER, JAMES

PERSONAL/INDIVIDUAL SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 10/27/2020 FOR KINDER, ELIZABETH

10/27/2020: PERSONAL/INDIVIDUAL SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 10/27/2020 FOR KINDER, ELIZABETH

STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES IN DIVISION 55

10/27/2020: STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES IN DIVISION 55

PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME EFFECT SERVICE OF PROCESS ON DEFENDANTS

2/16/2021: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME EFFECT SERVICE OF PROCESS ON DEFENDANTS

ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO EFFECT SERVICE OF PROCESS ON DEFENDANTS

3/1/2021: ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO EFFECT SERVICE OF PROCESS ON DEFENDANTS

PLAINTIFF'S SECOND MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO EFFECT SERVICE OF PROCESS ON DEFENDANTS

6/24/2021: PLAINTIFF'S SECOND MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO EFFECT SERVICE OF PROCESS ON DEFENDANTS

ORDER DENYING SECOND FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME

6/28/2021: ORDER DENYING SECOND FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME

ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE AND WAIVER OF FORMAL SERVICE OF PROCESS

7/19/2021: ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE AND WAIVER OF FORMAL SERVICE OF PROCESS

NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE

7/28/2021: NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

10/21/2021

DocketEntry: JOINT STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/20/2021

DocketEntry: ATTORNEY: ERTL, CHRISTENE MIELE ASSIGNED TO KINDER, JAMES

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/20/2021

DocketEntry: ATTORNEY: ERTL, CHRISTENE MIELE ASSIGNED TO KINDER, ELIZABETH

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/28/2021
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/19/2021
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE AND WAIVER OF FORMAL SERVICE OF PROCESS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/28/2021

DocketEntry: EMAIL SENT TO: MCDOWELL, BRANDON RAY REGARDING SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT CA20-1145, WALDEN CHASE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC VS. KINDER, JAMES WITH 1 ATTACHMENTS FROM DOCKET: ORDER DENYING SECOND FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME-6/28/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/28/2021
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: ORDER DENYING SECOND FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/24/2021
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: PLAINTIFF'S SECOND MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO EFFECT SERVICE OF PROCESS ON DEFENDANTS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/01/2021

DocketEntry: EMAIL SENT TO: MCDOWELL, BRANDON RAY REGARDING SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT CA20-1145, WALDEN CHASE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC VS. KINDER, JAMES WITH 1 ATTACHMENTS FROM DOCKET: ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO EFFECT SERVICE OF PROCESS ON DEFENDANTS-3/1/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/01/2021
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO EFFECT SERVICE OF PROCESS ON DEFENDANTS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
10/27/2020
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES IN DIVISION 55

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/27/2020
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: PERSONAL/INDIVIDUAL SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 10/27/2020 FOR KINDER, ELIZABETH

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/27/2020
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: PERSONAL/INDIVIDUAL SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 10/27/2020 FOR KINDER, JAMES

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/27/2020

DocketEntry: ATTORNEY: MCDOWELL, BRANDON RAY ASSIGNED TO WALDEN CHASE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/27/2020

DocketEntry: JUDGE MALTZ, HOWARD M.: ASSIGNED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/27/2020

DocketEntry: CASE FILED 10/27/2020 CASE NUMBER CA20-1145

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/26/2020
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/26/2020
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR SPECIFIC PERFORMANCE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/26/2020
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/26/2020
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less