Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from St. Johns County Courts on 07/08/2021 at 17:04:33 (UTC).

VELOCITY INVESTMENTS LLC vs. GEYER, THOMAS

Case Summary

On 06/10/2021 VELOCITY INVESTMENTS LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against GEYER, THOMAS. This case was filed in St. Johns County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Johns, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CHRISTINE, ALEXANDER R JR. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1957

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    St. Johns County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Johns, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CHRISTINE, ALEXANDER R JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VELOCITY INVESTMENTS LLC

Defendant

GEYER, THOMAS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MARCADIS, RALPH SAM

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

6/10/2021: COMPLAINT

PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 06/10/2021 FOR GEYER, THOMAS

6/10/2021: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 06/10/2021 FOR GEYER, THOMAS

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/30/2021
  • HearingEvent: PRETRIAL HEARING (SP/CC); Judge: CHRISTINE, ALEXANDER R JR; Location: Courtroom 255

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $185.00 RECEIPT #2021020811

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 06/10/2021 FOR GEYER, THOMAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketEntry: PRETRIAL HEARING (SP/CC) SET FOR 08/30/2021 AT 2:00 PM IN 255/ , JDG: CHRISTINE, ALEXANDER R JR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketEntry: ATTORNEY: MARCADIS, RALPH SAM ASSIGNED TO VELOCITY INVESTMENTS LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketEntry: JUDGE CHRISTINE, ALEXANDER R JR: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 06/10/2021 CASE NUMBER SP21-1957

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Velocity Investments LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Marcadis, Ralph S