This case was last updated from St. Johns County Courts on 11/29/2021 at 20:14:09 (UTC).

U.S BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION vs. KEYSTONE BEHAVIORAL PEDIATRICS LLC

Case Summary

On 04/08/2021 U S BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against KEYSTONE BEHAVIORAL PEDIATRICS LLC. This case was filed in St. Johns County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Johns, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MALTZ, HOWARD M.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0415

  • Filing Date:

    04/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Johns, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MALTZ, HOWARD M.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

U.S BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

Defendant

KEYSTONE BEHAVIORAL PEDIATRICS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

EMANUEL, RONALD M

Defendant Attorney

HYDE, RYAN THOMAS

 

Court Documents

NOTICE TO JUDGMENT DEBTOR

4/8/2021: NOTICE TO JUDGMENT DEBTOR

COVER LETTER

4/8/2021: COVER LETTER

NOTICE OF ENTRY AND STATEMENT OF JUDGMENT/ BK 5232 PG 674

4/8/2021: NOTICE OF ENTRY AND STATEMENT OF JUDGMENT/ BK 5232 PG 674

PLAINTIFF'S AFFIDAVIT / BK 5232 PG 672

4/8/2021: PLAINTIFF'S AFFIDAVIT / BK 5232 PG 672

PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2021012329

4/8/2021: PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2021012329

RETURN OF DOMESTIC RETURN RECEIPT FOR KEYSTONE BEHAVIORAL PEDIATRICS LLC

4/15/2021: RETURN OF DOMESTIC RETURN RECEIPT FOR KEYSTONE BEHAVIORAL PEDIATRICS LLC

MOTION TO DISMISS OR STRIKE DEFENDANT'S COMPLAINT CONTESTING VALIDITY OF FOREIGN JUDGMENT

5/21/2021: MOTION TO DISMISS OR STRIKE DEFENDANT'S COMPLAINT CONTESTING VALIDITY OF FOREIGN JUDGMENT

AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING - JULY 8, 2021 AT 4:15PM

6/25/2021: AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING - JULY 8, 2021 AT 4:15PM

MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL AND TO CONTINUE JULY 8, 2021 HEARING

7/2/2021: MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL AND TO CONTINUE JULY 8, 2021 HEARING

NOTICE OF HEARING - JULY 8, 2021 AT 4:00PM

7/6/2021: NOTICE OF HEARING - JULY 8, 2021 AT 4:00PM

8/11/2021

33: 8/11/2021

7/8/2021

26: 7/8/2021

5/7/2021

15: 5/7/2021

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - Recorded (OR.5415.106 / 2021121534)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketEntry: REOPENED CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketEntry: ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S EX-PARTE MOTION TO VACATE JUDGMENT - Recorded (OR.5403.1456 / 2021116559)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketEntry: EMAIL SENT TO: EMANUEL, RONALD M; HYDE, RYAN THOMAS REGARDING SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT CA21-0415, U.S BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION VS. KEYSTONE BEHAVIORAL PEDIATRICS LLC WITH 1 ATTACHMENTS FROM DOCKET: ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S EX-PARTE MOTION TO VACATE JUDGMENT-10/26/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketEntry: ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S EX-PARTE MOTION TO VACATE JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketEntry: EX-PARTE MOTION TO VACATE JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • HearingEvent: HEARING (CIVIL); Judge: MALTZ, HOWARD M.; Location: Zoom; Result: CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING - ON AUGUST 12, 2021, AT 11:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketEntry: EMAIL SENT TO: HYDE, RYAN THOMAS; EMANUEL, RONALD M; BURNETT, JASON BOYD REGARDING SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT CA21-0415, U.S BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION VS. KEYSTONE BEHAVIORAL PEDIATRICS LLC WITH 2 ATTACHMENTS FROM DOCKET: ORDER GRANTING JUDGMENT DEBTOR'S AMENDED MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL; ORDER GRANTING JUDGMENT DEBTOR'S MOTION TO CONTINUE HEARING -7/14/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE TO JUDGMENT DEBTOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2021012329

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketEntry: ATTORNEY: EMANUEL, RONALD M ASSIGNED TO U.S BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PLAINTIFF'S AFFIDAVIT / BK 5232 PG 672

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketEntry: JUDGE MALTZ, HOWARD M.: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF ENTRY AND STATEMENT OF JUDGMENT/ BK 5232 PG 674

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: COVER LETTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketEntry: FOREIGN JUDGMENT ASSESSED $410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 04/08/2021 CASE NUMBER CA21-0415

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U.S. Bank, N.A. as Trustee for the RMAC Trust, Series 2016-CTT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer EMANUEL ESQ, RONALD M