This case was last updated from St. Johns County Courts on 06/05/2023 at 19:07:37 (UTC).

UNIVERSAL PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY A/S/O MELISSA AND LEWIS A FRASER vs. JAMES PATRICK GANNON, AS TRUSTEE OF THE JAMES PATRICK GANNON LIVING TRUST DATED 11/18/2015

Case Summary

On 03/07/2023 UNIVERSAL PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY A/S/O MELISSA AND LEWIS A FRASER filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against JAMES PATRICK GANNON, AS TRUSTEE OF THE JAMES PATRICK GANNON LIVING TRUST DATED 11/18/2015. This case was filed in St. Johns County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Johns, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BLOCKER, LAUREN P. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0698

  • Filing Date:

    03/07/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Johns, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BLOCKER, LAUREN P

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

UNIVERSAL PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY A/S/O MELISSA AND LEWIS A FRASER

Defendant

JAMES PATRICK GANNON, AS TRUSTEE OF THE JAMES PATRICK GANNON LIVING TRUST DATED

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RODRIGUEZ, DIANA E

 

Court Documents

PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 03/09/2023 FOR GANNON, JAMES PATRICK

3/9/2023: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 03/09/2023 FOR GANNON, JAMES PATRICK

AMENDED PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 03/13/2023 FOR JAMES PATRICK GANNON, AS TRUSTEE OF THE JAMES PATRICK GANNON LIVING TRUST DATED 11/18/2015

3/13/2023: AMENDED PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 03/13/2023 FOR JAMES PATRICK GANNON, AS TRUSTEE OF THE JAMES PATRICK GANNON LIVING TRUST DATED 11/18/2015

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2023
  • HearingEvent: PRETRIAL HEARING (SP/CC); Judge: BLOCKER, LAUREN P; Location: Courtroom 228; Result: COMPLETED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • DocketEntry: PRETRIAL COURT NOTES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • DocketEntry: EMAIL SENT TO: RODRIGUEZ, DIANA E REGARDING SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT SP23-0698, UNIVERSAL PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY A/S/O MELISSA AND LEWIS A FRASER VS. JAMES PATRICK GANNON, AS TRUSTEE OF THE JAMES PATRICK GANNON LIVING TRUST DATED 11/18/2015 WITH 1 ATTACHMENTS FROM DOCKET: AMENDED PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SUMMONS-3/13/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: AMENDED PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 03/13/2023 FOR JAMES PATRICK GANNON, AS TRUSTEE OF THE JAMES PATRICK GANNON LIVING TRUST DATED 11/18/2015

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2023009460

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 03/09/2023 FOR GANNON, JAMES PATRICK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • DocketEntry: PRETRIAL HEARING (SP/CC) SET FOR 04/12/2023 AT 2:00 PM IN 228/ , JDG: BLOCKER, LAUREN P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $300.00 RECEIPT #2023009087

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • DocketEntry: ATTORNEY: RODRIGUEZ, DIANA E ASSIGNED TO UNIVERSAL PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • DocketEntry: JUDGE BLOCKER, LAUREN P: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 03/07/2023 CASE NUMBER SP23-0698

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF SERVICE PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • DocketEntry: PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • DocketEntry: COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less