Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from St. Johns County Courts on 02/19/2020 at 19:06:51 (UTC).

TWOMBLY, DIANA vs. AMERICAN STRATEGIC INSURANCE CORP.

Case Summary

On 06/08/2017 TWOMBLY, DIANA filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against AMERICAN STRATEGIC INSURANCE CORP. This case was filed in St. Johns County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Johns, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are TRAYNOR, J MICHAEL and SMITH, R. LEE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0634

  • Filing Date:

    06/08/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    St. Johns County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Johns, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

TRAYNOR, J MICHAEL

SMITH, R. LEE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TWOMBLY, DIANA

Defendant

AMERICAN STRATEGIC INSURANCE CORP.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VON ROENN, NICOLLE P

Defendant Attorneys

DICUS, WESLEY C SR

PATEL, ASIKA

HAWKINS, NIKKI ELIZABETH

 

Court Documents

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

6/19/2017: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

6/19/2017: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

6/19/2017: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO SUMMONS ISSUED ON 06/08/2017 FOR AMERICAN STRATEGIC INSURANCE COMPANY

6/8/2017: CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO SUMMONS ISSUED ON 06/08/2017 FOR AMERICAN STRATEGIC INSURANCE COMPANY

COMPLAINT

6/8/2017: COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/28/2019
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - Recorded (OR.4786.971 / 2019063991)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • DocketEntry: JUDGE SMITH, R LEE: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • HearingEvent: CIVIL DOCKET SOUNDING; Judge: TRAYNOR, J MICHAEL; Location: Courtroom 316; Result: CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • DocketEntry: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • DocketEntry: MEDIATION DISPOSITION REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • DocketEntry: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO DEFENDANT'S INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • DocketEntry: DEFENDANT AMERICAN TRATEGIC INSURANCE COMPANY'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLAINTIFF, DIANNA TWOMBLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANT, AMERICAN STRATEGIC INSURANCE COMPANY'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF, DIANNA TWOMBLY

    Read MoreRead Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 06/09/2017
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2017019764

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2017
  • DocketEntry: CA/DR SUMMONS ASSESSED $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2017
  • DocketEntry: CONTRACT AND INDEBTNESS ASSESSED $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO SUMMONS ISSUED ON 06/08/2017 FOR AMERICAN STRATEGIC INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2017
  • DocketEntry: COVER LETTER TO CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2017
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2017
  • DocketEntry: ATTORNEY: VON ROENN, NICOLLE ASSIGNED TO TWOMBLY, DIANA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2017
  • DocketEntry: JUDGE TRAYNOR, J MICHAEL: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2017
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 06/08/2017 CASE NUMBER CA17-0634

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN STRATEGIC INSURANCE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Von Roenn, Nicolle P