This case was last updated from St. Johns County Courts on 01/16/2022 at 18:16:33 (UTC).

THOMAS, ARCHIBALD J 3 vs. CYPREX HOLDINGS LLC

Case Summary

On 11/17/2021 THOMAS, ARCHIBALD J 3 filed an Other lawsuit against CYPREX HOLDINGS LLC. This case was filed in St. Johns County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Johns, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MALTZ, HOWARD M.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1298

  • Filing Date:

    11/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Johns, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MALTZ, HOWARD M.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

THOMAS, ARCHIBALD J 3

THOMAS, MARTHA A

Defendants

CYPREX HOLDINGS LLC

DGG RE INVESTMENTS LLC

HSBC BANK, USA, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, AS TRUSTEE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

1 THOMAS, ARCHIBALD J III

2 KANUPP, SAMUEL B

3 KANUPP, SAMUEL B

2 THOMAS, ARCHIBALD J III

Defendant Attorneys

REPPAS, MICHAEL J.

MARSH, KRISTINA L

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/16/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

11/16/2021: COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES IN DIVISION 55

11/17/2021: STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES IN DIVISION 55

AOSC20-23 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

11/17/2021: AOSC20-23 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 11/19/2021 FOR CYPREX HOLDINGS LLC

11/19/2021: CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 11/19/2021 FOR CYPREX HOLDINGS LLC

CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 11/19/2021 FOR DGG RE INVESTMENTS LLC

11/19/2021: CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 11/19/2021 FOR DGG RE INVESTMENTS LLC

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketEntry: ATTORNEY: MARSH, KRISTINA L ASSIGNED TO DGG RE INVESTMENTS LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketEntry: DEFENDANT, DGG RE INVESTMENTS LLC D/B/A GUARDIAN ASSET MANAGEMENT'S, MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketEntry: DEFENDANT GEOVERA SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY'S NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS COUNSEL AND NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS FOR E-SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketEntry: ATTORNEY: REPPAS, MICHAEL J. ASSIGNED TO CYPREX HOLDINGS LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketEntry: MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 11/19/2021 FOR DGG RE INVESTMENTS LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 11/19/2021 FOR CYPREX HOLDINGS LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2021039383

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketEntry: ATTORNEY: KANUPP, SAMUEL B ASSIGNED TO THOMAS, MARTHA A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketEntry: ATTORNEY: KANUPP, SAMUEL B ASSIGNED TO THOMAS, ARCHIBALD J 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketEntry: EMAIL SENT TO: THOMAS, ARCHIBALD J III REGARDING SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT CA21-1298, THOMAS, ARCHIBALD J 3 VS. CYPREX HOLDINGS LLC WITH 1 ATTACHMENTS FROM DOCKET: AOSC20-23 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER -11/17/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: AOSC20-23 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES IN DIVISION 55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketEntry: ATTORNEY: THOMAS, ARCHIBALD J III ASSIGNED TO THOMAS, ARCHIBALD J 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketEntry: JUDGE MALTZ, HOWARD M.: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 11/17/2021 CASE NUMBER CA21-1298

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HSBC Bank USA, N.A. is a litigant