Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from St. Johns County Courts on 05/07/2021 at 17:02:12 (UTC).

THE KIDWELL GROUP LLC DBA AIR QUALITY ASSESSORS OF FLORIDA A/A/AO ROBERT HUENEFELD vs. OLYMPUS INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 04/09/2021 THE KIDWELL GROUP LLC DBA AIR QUALITY ASSESSORS OF FLORIDA A/A/AO ROBERT HUENEFELD filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against OLYMPUS INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in St. Johns County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Johns, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is TINLIN, CHARLES. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1202

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    St. Johns County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Johns, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

TINLIN, CHARLES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE KIDWELL GROUP LLC DBA AIR QUALITY ASSESSORS OF FLORIDA A/A/AO ROBERT HUENEFELD

Defendant

OLYMPUS INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GONZALEZ, ROBERT F

Defendant Attorney

AGUILAR, ANDREA NICOLE

 

Court Documents

MOTION TO INVOKE THE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE AND TO WAIVE PARTIES' APPEARANCE AT THE PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE

4/27/2021: MOTION TO INVOKE THE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE AND TO WAIVE PARTIES' APPEARANCE AT THE PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE

CERTIFICATE OF SERVING 2ND SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT, OLYMPUS INSURANCE COMPANY

4/27/2021: CERTIFICATE OF SERVING 2ND SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT, OLYMPUS INSURANCE COMPANY

CERTIFICATE OF SERVING 2ND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT, OLYMPUS INSURANCE COMPANY

4/27/2021: CERTIFICATE OF SERVING 2ND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT, OLYMPUS INSURANCE COMPANY

OF SERVING FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT OLYMPUS INSURANCE COMPANY

4/27/2021: OF SERVING FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT OLYMPUS INSURANCE COMPANY

NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 2.516 DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

4/26/2021: NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 2.516 DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

SUMMONS RETURNED - PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO RETURNED SERVED ON 04/19/2021 OLYMPUS INSURANCE COMPANY -ELECTRONIC DELIVERY

4/19/2021: SUMMONS RETURNED - PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO RETURNED SERVED ON 04/19/2021 OLYMPUS INSURANCE COMPANY -ELECTRONIC DELIVERY

PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 04/09/2021 FOR OLYMPUS INSURANCE COMPANY

4/9/2021: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 04/09/2021 FOR OLYMPUS INSURANCE COMPANY

CERTIFICATE OF SERVING FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT OLYMPUS INSURANCE COMPANY

4/9/2021: CERTIFICATE OF SERVING FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT OLYMPUS INSURANCE COMPANY

CERTIFICATE OF SERVING FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT OLYMPUS INSURANCE COMPANY

4/9/2021: CERTIFICATE OF SERVING FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT OLYMPUS INSURANCE COMPANY

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES PURSUANT TO FLORIDA RULES OF JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATION 2.51B1A

4/9/2021: DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES PURSUANT TO FLORIDA RULES OF JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATION 2.51B1A

CIVIL COVER SHEET

4/9/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

4/9/2021: COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/28/2021
  • HearingEvent: PRETRIAL HEARING (SP/CC); Judge: TINLIN, CHARLES; Location: Courtroom 216

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: MOTION TO INVOKE THE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE AND TO WAIVE PARTIES' APPEARANCE AT THE PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CERTIFICATE OF SERVING 2ND SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT, OLYMPUS INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CERTIFICATE OF SERVING 2ND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT, OLYMPUS INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: OF SERVING FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT OLYMPUS INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketEntry: COULD NOT PARSE DOCKET CODE TEXT FOR DOCKETCODE = CIVILATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 2.516 DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS RETURNED - PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO RETURNED SERVED ON 04/19/2021 OLYMPUS INSURANCE COMPANY -ELECTRONIC DELIVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2021012667

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 04/09/2021 FOR OLYMPUS INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketEntry: PRETRIAL HEARING (SP/CC) SET FOR 06/28/2021 AT 2:00 PM IN 216/ , JDG: TINLIN, CHARLES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CERTIFICATE OF SERVING FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT OLYMPUS INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CERTIFICATE OF SERVING FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT OLYMPUS INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES PURSUANT TO FLORIDA RULES OF JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATION 2.51B1A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketEntry: ATTORNEY: GONZALEZ, ROBERT F ASSIGNED TO THE KIDWELL GROUP LLC DBA AIR QUALITY ASSESSORS OF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketEntry: JUDGE TINLIN, CHARLES: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 04/09/2021 CASE NUMBER SP21-1202

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Kidwell Group LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Olympus Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gonzalez, Robert Francis, ESQ.