This case was last updated from St. Johns County - Seventh Judicial Circuit Court on 05/02/2023 at 19:42:44 (UTC).

THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON vs. SEARCY, GEORGE

Case Summary

On 01/31/2023 THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against SEARCY, GEORGE. This case was filed in St. Johns County - Seventh Judicial Circuit Court, St. Johns County Circuit Court located in St. Johns, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MALTZ, HOWARD M.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0126

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    St. Johns, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MALTZ, HOWARD M.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON

Defendants

SEARCY, GEORGE

WALDEN CHASE HOMEOWNER'S ASSOCIATION, INC.

UNKNOWN TENANT # 2

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JILL SEARCY

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF GEORGE SEARCY

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

SEARCY, JILL

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC

UNKNOWN TENANT # 1 N/K/A JAMES SEARCY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DUGGAR, JASON L

Defendant Attorneys

MATTINGLY, KARENA JOY

RUDY, JOHN F III

 

Court Documents

DISCLAIMER OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

4/28/2023: DISCLAIMER OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY DEFENDANTS - RECORDED (OR.5746.1835. / 2023031605)

4/27/2023: NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY DEFENDANTS - RECORDED (OR.5746.1835. / 2023031605)

NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

3/15/2023: NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON 04/03/2023 FOR UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

4/4/2023: CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON 04/03/2023 FOR UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

3/15/2023: NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY DEFENDANTS

3/15/2023: NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY DEFENDANTS

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF WALDEN CHASE HOMEOWNER'S ASSOCIATION, INC.

2/13/2023: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF WALDEN CHASE HOMEOWNER'S ASSOCIATION, INC.

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

2/3/2023: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

PAYMENT $995.00 RECEIPT #2023004086

2/1/2023: PAYMENT $995.00 RECEIPT #2023004086

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS - RECORDED (OR.5702.869. / 2023007887)

1/31/2023: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS - RECORDED (OR.5702.869. / 2023007887)

CERTIFICATION OF PHYSICAL POSSESSION OF ORIGINAL PROMISSORY NOTE

1/30/2023: CERTIFICATION OF PHYSICAL POSSESSION OF ORIGINAL PROMISSORY NOTE

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

1/30/2023: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

CIVIL COVER SHEET

1/30/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

CLERK DEFAULT // ENTERED AGAINST JILL SEARCY; GEORGE SEARCY; UNKNOWN TENANT #1 N/K/A JAMES SEARCY

3/15/2023: CLERK DEFAULT // ENTERED AGAINST JILL SEARCY; GEORGE SEARCY; UNKNOWN TENANT #1 N/K/A JAMES SEARCY

MOTION FOR CLERK DEFAULT

3/15/2023: MOTION FOR CLERK DEFAULT

PERSONAL OR INDIVIDUAL SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED ON 02/15/2023 FOR UNKNOWN TENANT # 2

3/11/2023: PERSONAL OR INDIVIDUAL SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED ON 02/15/2023 FOR UNKNOWN TENANT # 2

PERSONAL OR INDIVIDUAL SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON 02/15/2023 FOR SEARCY, GEORGE

3/11/2023: PERSONAL OR INDIVIDUAL SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON 02/15/2023 FOR SEARCY, GEORGE

PERSONAL OR INDIVIDUAL SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON 02/15/2023 FOR UNKNOWN TENANT # 1 N/K/A JAMES SEARCY

3/11/2023: PERSONAL OR INDIVIDUAL SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON 02/15/2023 FOR UNKNOWN TENANT # 1 N/K/A JAMES SEARCY

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/02/2023
  • DocketEntry: ATTORNEY: RUDY, JOHN F III ASSIGNED TO UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: DISCLAIMER OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY DEFENDANTS - RECORDED (OR.5746.1835. / 2023031605)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON 04/03/2023 FOR UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CLERK DEFAULT // ENTERED AGAINST JILL SEARCY; GEORGE SEARCY; UNKNOWN TENANT #1 N/K/A JAMES SEARCY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: MOTION FOR CLERK DEFAULT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY DEFENDANTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PERSONAL OR INDIVIDUAL SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED ON 02/15/2023 FOR UNKNOWN TENANT # 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PERSONAL OR INDIVIDUAL SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 01/31/2023 FOR UNKNOWN TENANT # 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PERSONAL OR INDIVIDUAL SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 01/31/2023 FOR UNKNOWN TENANT # 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PERSONAL OR INDIVIDUAL SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 01/31/2023 FOR WALDEN CHASE HOMEOWNER'S ASSOCIATION, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketEntry: ATTORNEY: DUGGAR, JASON L ASSIGNED TO THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON FKA THE BANK OF NEW YO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketEntry: JUDGE MALTZ, HOWARD M.: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 01/31/2023 CASE NUMBER CA23-0126

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketEntry: VERIFIED COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CERTIFICATION OF PHYSICAL POSSESSION OF ORIGINAL PROMISSORY NOTE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less