This case was last updated from St. Johns County Courts on 01/26/2023 at 16:28:36 (UTC).

TD BANK USA, N.A. vs. BARCINAS, FLORENCE S

Case Summary

On 01/12/2023 TD BANK USA, N A filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BARCINAS, FLORENCE S. This case was filed in St. Johns County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Johns, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CHRISTINE, ALEXANDER R JR. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0082

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Johns, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CHRISTINE, ALEXANDER R JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TD BANK USA, N.A.

Defendant

BARCINAS, FLORENCE S

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAVRAR, FLYNN

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

1/12/2023: COMPLAINT

PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 01/12/2023 FOR BARCINAS, FLORENCE S

1/12/2023: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 01/12/2023 FOR BARCINAS, FLORENCE S

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/17/2023
  • HearingEvent: PRETRIAL HEARING (SP/CC); Judge: CHRISTINE, ALEXANDER R JR; Location: Courtroom 216

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $185.00 RECEIPT #2023001911

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 01/12/2023 FOR BARCINAS, FLORENCE S

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketEntry: PRETRIAL HEARING (SP/CC) SET FOR 02/17/2023 AT 2:00 PM IN 216/ , JDG: CHRISTINE, ALEXANDER R JR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketEntry: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF LEAD ATTORNEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketEntry: LETTER FROM PLAINTIFF ATTORNEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketEntry: ATTORNEY: LAVRAR, FLYNN ASSIGNED TO TD BANK USA, N.A.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketEntry: JUDGE CHRISTINE, ALEXANDER R JR: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 01/12/2023 CASE NUMBER SP23-0082

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less