Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from St. Johns County Courts on 02/20/2020 at 14:33:45 (UTC).

SWIFT FINANCIAL CORPORATION vs. SOLID 9 LLC

Case Summary

On 07/31/2017 SWIFT FINANCIAL CORPORATION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SOLID 9 LLC. This case was filed in St. Johns County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Johns, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is TRAYNOR, J MICHAEL. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0873

  • Filing Date:

    07/31/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    St. Johns County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Johns, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

TRAYNOR, J MICHAEL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SWIFT FINANCIAL CORPORATION

Defendants

PENNINGTON, KIMBERLY

SOLID 9 LLC

PENNINGTON, JUSTIN

SOLID SOUNDS RETAIL LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

WAGNER, BRIAN L

ALVARO - INACTIVE, CHAD K

Defendant Attorney

MARKEY, BRADLEY ROBERT

 

Court Documents

FINAL JUDGMENT CONFIRMING ARBITRATION AWARD - Recorded (OR.4447.1428 / 2017069506)

10/13/2017: FINAL JUDGMENT CONFIRMING ARBITRATION AWARD - Recorded (OR.4447.1428 / 2017069506)

FINAL JUDGMENT CONFIRMING ARBITRATION AWARD

10/12/2017: FINAL JUDGMENT CONFIRMING ARBITRATION AWARD

CIVIL COURT NOTES

10/12/2017: CIVIL COURT NOTES

NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT OF AWARD, ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS

10/4/2017: NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT OF AWARD, ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS

NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC HEARING - OCTOBER 12, 2017 @ 10:00 A.M.

9/25/2017: NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC HEARING - OCTOBER 12, 2017 @ 10:00 A.M.

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

9/25/2017: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

8/14/2017: ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

PAYMENT $440.00 RECEIPT #2017026156

8/1/2017: PAYMENT $440.00 RECEIPT #2017026156

ORDER UPON FILING

7/31/2017: ORDER UPON FILING

PERSONAL/INDIVIDUAL SUMMONS STATUS SET TO SUMMONS ISSUED ON 07/31/2017 FOR KIMBERLY PENNINGTON

7/31/2017: PERSONAL/INDIVIDUAL SUMMONS STATUS SET TO SUMMONS ISSUED ON 07/31/2017 FOR KIMBERLY PENNINGTON

PERSONAL/INDIVIDUAL SUMMONS STATUS SET TO SUMMONS ISSUED ON 07/31/2017 FOR JUSTIN PENNINGTON

7/31/2017: PERSONAL/INDIVIDUAL SUMMONS STATUS SET TO SUMMONS ISSUED ON 07/31/2017 FOR JUSTIN PENNINGTON

CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO SUMMONS ISSUED ON 07/31/2017 FOR SOLID SOUNDS RETAIL LLC D/B/A SOLID SOUND

7/31/2017: CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO SUMMONS ISSUED ON 07/31/2017 FOR SOLID SOUNDS RETAIL LLC D/B/A SOLID SOUND

CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO SUMMONS ISSUED ON 07/31/2017 FOR SOLID 9 LLC

7/31/2017: CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO SUMMONS ISSUED ON 07/31/2017 FOR SOLID 9 LLC

COVER LETTER TO CLERK

7/31/2017: COVER LETTER TO CLERK

CIVIL COVER SHEET

7/31/2017: CIVIL COVER SHEET

MOTION FOR CONFIRMATION OF ARBITRATION AWARD AND ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

7/31/2017: MOTION FOR CONFIRMATION OF ARBITRATION AWARD AND ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/09/2018
  • DocketEntry: ATTORNEY: WAGNER, BRIAN L ASSIGNED TO SWIFT FINANCIAL CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS COUNSEL AND EMAIL DESIGNATION / PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: FINAL JUDGMENT CONFIRMING ARBITRATION AWARD - Recorded (OR.4447.1428 / 2017069506)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • HearingEvent: HEARING (CIVIL); Judge: TRAYNOR, J MICHAEL; Location: Chambers; Result: COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: FINAL JUDGMENT CONFIRMING ARBITRATION AWARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COURT NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT OF AWARD, ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • DocketEntry: ATTORNEY: MARKEY, BRADLEY ROBERT ASSIGNED TO PENNINGTON, KIMBERLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • DocketEntry: ATTORNEY: MARKEY, BRADLEY ROBERT ASSIGNED TO PENNINGTON, JUSTIN

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 07/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PERSONAL/INDIVIDUAL SUMMONS STATUS SET TO SUMMONS ISSUED ON 07/31/2017 FOR JUSTIN PENNINGTON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO SUMMONS ISSUED ON 07/31/2017 FOR SOLID SOUNDS RETAIL LLC D/B/A SOLID SOUND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO SUMMONS ISSUED ON 07/31/2017 FOR SOLID 9 LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: COVER LETTER TO CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: MOTION FOR CONFIRMATION OF ARBITRATION AWARD AND ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • DocketEntry: ATTORNEY: ALVARO, CHAD K ASSIGNED TO SWIFT FINANCIAL CORPORATION DBA SWIFT CAPITAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • DocketEntry: JUDGE TRAYNOR, J MICHAEL: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 07/31/2017 CASE NUMBER CA17-0873

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Swift Financial LLC as Servicing Agent for Webbank is a litigant