Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from St. Johns County Courts on 02/18/2020 at 18:04:13 (UTC).

SUP ATX LLC vs. GALLAGHER, GEOFFREY

Case Summary

On 03/24/2017 SUP ATX LLC filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against GALLAGHER, GEOFFREY. This case was filed in St. Johns County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Johns, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is TRAYNOR, J MICHAEL. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0327

  • Filing Date:

    03/24/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • Court:

    St. Johns County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Johns, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

TRAYNOR, J MICHAEL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SUP ATX LLC

Defendant

GALLAGHER, GEOFFREY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MURTHA, KEVIN MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

PERSONAL/INDIVIDUAL SUMMONS STATUS SET TO SUMMONS ISSUED ON 07/19/2017 FOR GEOFFREY GALLAGHER AN INDIVIDUAL DBA KLAVES MARINA

7/19/2017: PERSONAL/INDIVIDUAL SUMMONS STATUS SET TO SUMMONS ISSUED ON 07/19/2017 FOR GEOFFREY GALLAGHER AN INDIVIDUAL DBA KLAVES MARINA

COMPLAINT

3/23/2017: COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/24/2019
  • DocketEntry: MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO POST JUDGMENT REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • DocketEntry: POST JUDGMENT REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • DocketEntry: POST JUDGMENT REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • DocketEntry: FINAL JUDGMENT FOR PLAINTIFF - Recorded (OR.4644.987 / 2018084017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • DocketEntry: EMAIL SENT TO: MURTHA, KEVIN MICHAEL REGARDING SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT CA17-0327, SUP ATX LLC VS. GALLAGHER, GEOFFREY WITH 1 ATTACHMENTS FROM DOCKET: FINAL JUDGMENT FOR PLAINTIFF-11/19/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • DocketEntry: FINAL JUDGMENT FOR PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • DocketEntry: LETTER DATED NOVEMBER 19, 2018 TO JUDGE TRAYNOR FROM KEVIN M. MURTHA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE AS TO DEFENDANT DEFAULT IN STIPULATION OF PAYMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT STIPULATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • DocketEntry: CA/DR SUMMONS ASSESSED $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PERSONAL/INDIVIDUAL SUMMONS STATUS SET TO SUMMONS ISSUED ON 07/19/2017 FOR GEOFFREY GALLAGHER AN INDIVIDUAL DBA KLAVES MARINA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2017010576

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • DocketEntry: OTHER CIVIL ASSESSED $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • DocketEntry: ATTORNEY: MURTHA, KEVIN MICHAEL ASSIGNED TO SUP ATX LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • DocketEntry: JUDGE TRAYNOR, J MICHAEL: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 03/24/2017 CASE NUMBER CA17-0327

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • DocketEntry: COVER LETTER TO CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MURTHA KEVIN M