This case was last updated from St. Johns County - Seventh Judicial Circuit Court on 05/02/2023 at 19:44:54 (UTC).

STATE FARM FLORIDA INSURANCE COMPANY vs. GLOBAL ROOFING SOLUTIONS, INC.

Case Summary

On 01/31/2023 STATE FARM FLORIDA INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against GLOBAL ROOFING SOLUTIONS, INC. This case was filed in St. Johns County - Seventh Judicial Circuit Court, St. Johns County Circuit Court located in St. Johns, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MALTZ, HOWARD M.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0125

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    St. Johns, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MALTZ, HOWARD M.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

STATE FARM FLORIDA INSURANCE COMPANY

SMITH, DEBORAH

Defendants

GLOBAL ROOFING SOLUTIONS, INC.

LEAF HOME WATER SOLUTIONS, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LOTANE, TROY R

Defendant Attorneys

2 MAXEY, JESSICA

0 ROSNER, GARY S.

 

Court Documents

CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 01/31/2023 FOR GLOBAL ROOFING SOLUTIONS, INC.

1/31/2023: CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 01/31/2023 FOR GLOBAL ROOFING SOLUTIONS, INC.

CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 01/31/2023 FOR LEAF HOME WATER SOLUTIONS, LLC

1/31/2023: CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 01/31/2023 FOR LEAF HOME WATER SOLUTIONS, LLC

AOSC20-23 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

1/31/2023: AOSC20-23 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES IN DIVISION 55

1/31/2023: STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES IN DIVISION 55

PAYMENT $420.00 RECEIPT #2023004092

2/1/2023: PAYMENT $420.00 RECEIPT #2023004092

CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON 02/22/2023 FOR LEAF HOME WATER SOLUTIONS, LLC

2/27/2023: CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON 02/22/2023 FOR LEAF HOME WATER SOLUTIONS, LLC

CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON 03/04/2023 FOR LEAF HOME WATER SOLUTIONS, LLC

3/10/2023: CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON 03/04/2023 FOR LEAF HOME WATER SOLUTIONS, LLC

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

3/10/2023: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/14/2023
  • DocketEntry: EMAIL SENT TO: LOTANE, TROY R; ROSNER, GARY S.; MAXEY, JESSICA REGARDING SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT CA23-0125, STATE FARM FLORIDA INSURANCE COMPANY VS. GLOBAL ROOFING SOLUTIONS, INC. WITH 1 ATTACHMENTS FROM DOCKET: AGREED ORDER ON DEFENDANT, LEAF HOMES WATER SOLUTIONS, LLC'S MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT-4/14/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2023
  • DocketEntry: AGREED ORDER ON DEFENDANT, LEAF HOMES WATER SOLUTIONS, LLC'S MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2023
  • DocketEntry: DEFENDANT, LEAF HOME WATER SOLUTIONS, LLC'S, MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • DocketEntry: AFFIDAVIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON 03/04/2023 FOR LEAF HOME WATER SOLUTIONS, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON 02/22/2023 FOR LEAF HOME WATER SOLUTIONS, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $420.00 RECEIPT #2023004092

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketEntry: EMAIL SENT TO: LOTANE, TROY R REGARDING SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT CA23-0125, STATE FARM FLORIDA INSURANCE COMPANY VS. GLOBAL ROOFING SOLUTIONS, INC. WITH 1 ATTACHMENTS FROM DOCKET: AOSC20-23 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER-1/31/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES IN DIVISION 55

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: AOSC20-23 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 01/31/2023 FOR LEAF HOME WATER SOLUTIONS, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 01/31/2023 FOR GLOBAL ROOFING SOLUTIONS, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketEntry: ATTORNEY: LOTANE, TROY R ASSIGNED TO SMITH, DEBORAH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketEntry: ATTORNEY: LOTANE, TROY R ASSIGNED TO STATE FARM FLORIDA INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketEntry: JUDGE MALTZ, HOWARD M.: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 01/31/2023 CASE NUMBER CA23-0125

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketEntry: COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less