This case was last updated from St. Johns County - Seventh Judicial Circuit Court on 01/26/2022 at 04:50:27 (UTC).

ST. JOHNS PROPERTIES FLORIDA, LLC vs. FRONT RUNNER BOATWORKS LLC

Case Summary

On 08/02/2021 ST JOHNS PROPERTIES FLORIDA, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against FRONT RUNNER BOATWORKS LLC. This case was filed in St. Johns County - Seventh Judicial Circuit Court, St. Johns County Circuit Court located in St. Johns, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MALTZ, HOWARD M.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0879

  • Filing Date:

    08/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    St. Johns, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MALTZ, HOWARD M.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ST. JOHNS PROPERTIES FLORIDA, LLC

Defendant

FRONT RUNNER BOATWORKS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FACKLER, MICHAEL TOMME

Defendant Attorney

BARAUSKAS, ALEKSAS ANDRIUS

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

7/30/2021: COMPLAINT

CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 08/02/2021 FOR FRONT RUNNER BOATWORKS LLC

8/2/2021: CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 08/02/2021 FOR FRONT RUNNER BOATWORKS LLC

STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES IN DIVISION 55

8/2/2021: STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES IN DIVISION 55

AOSC20-23 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

8/2/2021: AOSC20-23 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF DISMISSAL

12/30/2021: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF DISMISSAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketEntry: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF DISMISSAL - Recorded (OR.5457.1001 / 2021140657)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketEntry: DEFENDANT'S CERTIFICATION OF AUTHORITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketEntry: PLAINTIFF'S CERTIFICATION OF AUTHORITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketEntry: EMAIL SENT TO: FACKLER, MICHAEL TOMME; BARAUSKAS, ALEKSAS ANDRIUS REGARDING SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT CA21-0879, ST. JOHNS PROPERTIES FLORIDA, LLC VS. FRONT RUNNER BOATWORKS LLC WITH 1 ATTACHMENTS FROM DOCKET: CONSENT ORDER EXTENDING DEFENDANT'S PLEADING RESPONSE DEADLINE PENDING MEDIATION-9/24/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketEntry: CONSENT ORDER EXTENDING DEFENDANT'S PLEADING RESPONSE DEADLINE PENDING MEDIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketEntry: ATTORNEY: BARAUSKAS, ALEKSAS ANDRIUS ASSIGNED TO FRONT RUNNER BOATWORKS LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketEntry: CONSENT MOTION TO EXTEND DEFENDANT'S PLEADING RESPONSE DEADLINE PENDING MEDIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2021027174

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketEntry: EMAIL SENT TO: FACKLER, MICHAEL TOMME REGARDING SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT CA21-0879, ST. JOHNS PROPERTIES FLORIDA, LLC VS. FRONT RUNNER BOATWORKS LLC WITH 1 ATTACHMENTS FROM DOCKET: AOSC20-23 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER -8/2/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: AOSC20-23 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES IN DIVISION 55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 08/02/2021 FOR FRONT RUNNER BOATWORKS LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketEntry: ATTORNEY: FACKLER, MICHAEL TOMME ASSIGNED TO ST. JOHNS PROPERTIES FLORIDA, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketEntry: JUDGE MALTZ, HOWARD M.: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 08/02/2021 CASE NUMBER CA21-0879

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BARAUSKAS, ALEKSAS ANDRIUS