Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from St. Johns County Courts on 03/05/2020 at 19:08:52 (UTC).

SSCL, LLC, vs. ROMANO, PHILLIP

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 SSCL, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ROMANO, PHILLIP. This case was filed in St. Johns County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Johns, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SMITH, R. LEE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1767

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    St. Johns County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Johns, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SMITH, R. LEE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SSCL, LLC,

Defendants

DOE, JANE

ROMANO, PHILLIP

DOE, JOHN

JOHN DOE/JANE DOE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CURRIE, ALLYSON B

Defendant Attorneys

LEWIS, MARK E

LEWIS, MARK E.

 

Court Documents

DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

12/20/2019: DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE / PHILLIP ROMANO

12/20/2019: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE / PHILLIP ROMANO

EVICTION SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON 12/11/2019 FOR ROMANO, PHILLIP BY INDIVIDUAL SERVICE

12/17/2019: EVICTION SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON 12/11/2019 FOR ROMANO, PHILLIP BY INDIVIDUAL SERVICE

PAYMENT $450.00 RECEIPT #2019041220

12/10/2019: PAYMENT $450.00 RECEIPT #2019041220

ORDER UPON FILING (JUDGE SMITH STANDING ORDER DTD 01/09/19 RE: ALL CIVIL CASES)

12/9/2019: ORDER UPON FILING (JUDGE SMITH STANDING ORDER DTD 01/09/19 RE: ALL CIVIL CASES)

PERSONAL/ INDIVIDUAL SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 12/09/2019 FOR ROMANO, PHILLIP

12/9/2019: PERSONAL/ INDIVIDUAL SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 12/09/2019 FOR ROMANO, PHILLIP

PERSONAL/ INDIVIDUAL SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 12/09/2019 FOR DOE, JOHN

12/9/2019: PERSONAL/ INDIVIDUAL SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 12/09/2019 FOR DOE, JOHN

PERSONAL/ INDIVIDUAL SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 12/09/2019 FOR DOE, JANE

12/9/2019: PERSONAL/ INDIVIDUAL SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 12/09/2019 FOR DOE, JANE

EVICTION SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 12/09/2019 FOR JOHN DOE/JANE DOE

12/9/2019: EVICTION SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 12/09/2019 FOR JOHN DOE/JANE DOE

EVICTION SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 12/09/2019 FOR ROMANO, PHILLIP

12/9/2019: EVICTION SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 12/09/2019 FOR ROMANO, PHILLIP

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF PROPOUNDING FIRST INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

12/6/2019: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF PROPOUNDING FIRST INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT PHILLIP ROMANO

12/6/2019: PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT PHILLIP ROMANO

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/6/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION AND DECLARATORY JUDGMENT

12/6/2019: COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION AND DECLARATORY JUDGMENT

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/05/2020
  • HearingEvent: HEARING (CIVIL); Judge: SMITH, R. LEE; Location: Chambers; Result: COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COURT NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketEntry: DEFENDANT, PHILLIP ROMANO'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF, SSCL, LLC'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketEntry: DEFENDANT, PHILLIP ROMANO'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF RESPONSES TO INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketEntry: CROSS - NOTICE OF HEARING - MARCH 5, 2020 @ 10:00 A.M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketEntry: MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF HEARING - MARCH 5, 2020 AT 10:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketEntry: DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • DocketEntry: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR EXPEDITED HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • DocketEntry: PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PERSONAL/ INDIVIDUAL SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 12/09/2019 FOR DOE, JANE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: EVICTION SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 12/09/2019 FOR JOHN DOE/JANE DOE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: EVICTION SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 12/09/2019 FOR ROMANO, PHILLIP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketEntry: ATTORNEY: CURRIE, ALLYSON B ASSIGNED TO SSCL, LLC, A FLORIDA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketEntry: JUDGE SMITH, R. LEE: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF PROPOUNDING FIRST INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT PHILLIP ROMANO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION AND DECLARATORY JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 12/06/2019 CASE NUMBER CA19-1767

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CURRIE, ALLYSON B