Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from St. Johns County Courts on 02/20/2020 at 16:26:18 (UTC).

SHREYA HOSPITALITY, INC., A FLORIDA CORPORATION vs. NIX, MANSFIELD

Case Summary

On 08/09/2017 SHREYA HOSPITALITY, INC , A FLORIDA CORPORATION filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against NIX, MANSFIELD. This case was filed in St. Johns County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Johns, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are TRAYNOR, J MICHAEL and SMITH, R. LEE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0907

  • Filing Date:

    08/09/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • Court:

    St. Johns County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Johns, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

TRAYNOR, J MICHAEL

SMITH, R. LEE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SHREYA HOSPITALITY, INC., A FLORIDA CORPORATION

Defendant

NIX, MANSFIELD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NAJARIAN, ALEX CHRISTOPHER

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL - Recorded (OR.4532.1769 / 2018025827)

4/17/2018: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL - Recorded (OR.4532.1769 / 2018025827)

FINAL JUDGMENT AND ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT - Recorded (OR.4531.502 / 2018025006)

4/13/2018: FINAL JUDGMENT AND ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT - Recorded (OR.4531.502 / 2018025006)

PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT

1/9/2018: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT

PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY REQUESTS

11/21/2017: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY REQUESTS

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES

10/13/2017: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES

ANSWER / MANSFIELD NIX

9/26/2017: ANSWER / MANSFIELD NIX

PERSONAL/INDIVIDUAL SUMMONS STATUS SET TO SUMMONS ISSUED ON 08/09/2017 FOR MANSFIELD NIX

8/9/2017: PERSONAL/INDIVIDUAL SUMMONS STATUS SET TO SUMMONS ISSUED ON 08/09/2017 FOR MANSFIELD NIX

COMPLAINT

8/8/2017: COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/05/2019
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • DocketEntry: JUDGE SMITH, R LEE: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL - Recorded (OR.4532.1769 / 2018025827)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: FINAL JUDGMENT AND ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT - Recorded (OR.4531.502 / 2018025006)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2018
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2018
  • DocketEntry: EMAIL SENT TO: NAJARIAN, ALEX CHRISTOPHER; MANSFIELD NIX REGARDING SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT CA17-0907, SHREYA HOSPITALITY, INC., A FLORIDA CORPORATION VS. NIX, MANSFIELD WITH 1 ATTACHMENTS FROM DOCKET: FINAL JUDGMENT AND ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT-4/13/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2018
  • DocketEntry: FINAL JUDGMENT AND ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • HearingEvent: HEARING (CIVIL); Judge: TRAYNOR, J MICHAEL; Location: Chambers; Result: COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COURT NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • DocketEntry: PLAINTIFF'S AFFIDAVIT OF DAMAGES

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 08/09/2017
  • DocketEntry: CA/DR SUMMONS ASSESSED $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • DocketEntry: OTHER CIVIL ASSESSED $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • DocketEntry: ORDER UPON FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PERSONAL/INDIVIDUAL SUMMONS STATUS SET TO SUMMONS ISSUED ON 08/09/2017 FOR MANSFIELD NIX

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • DocketEntry: ATTORNEY: NAJARIAN, ALEX CHRISTOPHER ASSIGNED TO SHREYA HOSPITALITY, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • DocketEntry: JUDGE TRAYNOR, J MICHAEL: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 08/09/2017 CASE NUMBER CA17-0907

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • DocketEntry: COVER LETTER TO CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less