This case was last updated from St. Johns County - Seventh Judicial Circuit Court on 04/27/2020 at 19:57:47 (UTC).

SHAPING UP INC vs. KINGSTON DUNES HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

Case Summary

On 04/28/2008 SHAPING UP INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against KINGSTON DUNES HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC. This case was filed in St. Johns County - Seventh Judicial Circuit Court, St. Johns County Circuit Court located in St. Johns, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is TRAYNOR, J MICHAEL. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0917

  • Filing Date:

    04/28/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    St. Johns, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

TRAYNOR, J MICHAEL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SHAPING UP INC

Defendants

KINGSTON DUNES HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

MAY MANAGEMENT SERVICES INC

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

01/28/2009

DocketEntry: DISMISSAL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/28/2009

DocketEntry: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/28/2009

DocketEntry: ORDER OF DISMISSAL OR 3158 PG 679

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/18/2008

DocketEntry: RETURNED UNDELIVERABLE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/17/2008

DocketEntry: NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/13/2008

DocketEntry: ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/07/2008

DocketEntry: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS/ 2ND

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/06/2008

DocketEntry: MOTION TO DISMISS COUNT I & III OF 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT / W ANSWER& AFF DEFS TO COUNT II AND COUNTERCLAIM/ KINGSTON DUNES H O ASSOC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/04/2008

DocketEntry: AMENDED COMPLAINT 2ND

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/24/2008

DocketEntry: AMENDED COMPLAINT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
22 More Docket Entries
05/22/2008

DocketEntry: NOTICE OF MEDIATION DATE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/08/2008

DocketEntry: SUMS RTD SVD CORP KINGSTON DUNES H O ASSOC 5-6-08

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/08/2008

DocketEntry: SUMS RTD SVD CORP MAY MGMT 5-6-08

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/07/2008

DocketEntry: NOTICE OF SERVING INTERRS TO KINGSTON DUNES H O ASSOC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/07/2008

DocketEntry: NOTICE OF SERVING INTERRS TO MAY MGMT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/28/2008

DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/28/2008

DocketEntry: FILING FEE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/28/2008

DocketEntry: PAYMENT OF $255.00 BY: SHAPING UP INC, ON 04/28/2008

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/28/2008

DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/28/2008

DocketEntry: COMPLAINT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less